EP2562158 - Processes for the preparation of n-heteroaryl-N-aryl-amines by reacting an N-aryl carbamic acid ester with a halo-heteroaryl and analogous processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2014/35] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Inc. 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | ||
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snoonian, John 1 Blueberry Circle Ayer, MA Massachusetts 01432 / US | 02 /
Oliver-Shaffer, Patricia-Ann 5 Tupelo Way Acton Cambridge, MA Massachusetts 02139 / US | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12193459.0 | 10.02.2004 | [2013/09] | Priority number, date | US20030446641P | 10.02.2003 Original published format: US 446641 P | US20030474272P | 28.05.2003 Original published format: US 474272 P | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2562158 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/80, C07D213/79, C07D213/75, C07C273/18, C07C275/42, C07C275/30 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
C07D213/75 (EP,KR,US);
C07D213/80 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07D213/56 (EP,US);
C07D213/74 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | AL | 20.11.2012 | LT | 20.11.2012 | LV | 20.11.2012 | MK | 20.11.2012 | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Zubereitung von N-Heteroaryl-N-Aryl-Aminen durch Reagieren eines N-Aryl-Carbamidsäureesters mit einem Halo-Heteroaryl und analoge Verfahren | [2013/09] | English: | Processes for the preparation of n-heteroaryl-N-aryl-amines by reacting an N-aryl carbamic acid ester with a halo-heteroaryl and analogous processes | [2013/09] | French: | Procédés pour la préparation de n-hétéroaryl-N-aryl-aminés par mise en réaction d'un ester d'acide N-aryl-carbamique avec un halo-hétéroaryle et procédés analogues | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 26.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 03.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/32] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04709916.3 / EP1603878 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03000189 (BAYLOR COLLEGE MEDICINE [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 6, line 14 * * page 10, line 9; compound VX-702 * * claims 23,28,29,37,38,41 *; | [A]WO0214281 (COCHRAN JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 7 * * page 50; example 3; compounds 11,13 * * page 55; example 7 * * claims 1,13,15,20,21 * | by applicant | WO9621654 | WO9958502 | WO0017175 | - B. STEIN ET AL., ANN. REP. MED. CHEM., (1996), vol. 31, pages 289 - 98 | - R. B. KIMBLE ET AL., ENDOCRINOL., (1995), vol. 136, pages 3054 - 61 | - MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1992), pages 352 - 357 | - SYNTH. COMM., (1996), vol. 26, no. 12, pages 2257 - 2272 |