EP2563006 - Method for displaying character information, and image-taking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2017/31] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ayaki, Kenichiro 11-46 Senzui 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Mizuta, Tomoyuki 11-46 Senzui 3-chome Asaka-shi, Saitama / JP | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Stevens, Jason Paul Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12193477.2 | 09.05.2007 | [2013/09] | Priority number, date | JP20060134300 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: JP 2006134300 | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563006 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2563006 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/225, H04N5/232, G06K9/72, G06K9/22 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G06V30/142 (EP,US);
G06V30/268 (EP,US);
H04N23/00 (US);
H04N23/61 (EP,US);
H04N23/611 (EP,US);
H04N23/632 (EP,US);
H04N23/635 (EP,US);
H04N23/673 (EP,US);
H04N23/68 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/31] |
Former [2013/09] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anzeige von Zeicheninformationen und Bildaufnahmevorrichtung | [2013/09] | English: | Method for displaying character information, and image-taking device | [2013/09] | French: | Procédé pour l'affichage d'informations de caractère et dispositif de prise d'images | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 22.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 17.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07251914.3 / EP1855464 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070251914) is 10.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20010088527 (UNIVERSAL SOFT INFORMATION & C [KR]); | [A]JP2003029733 (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC); | [A]US2003113015 (TANAKA TOSHIAKI [JP]); | [A]JP2004056446 (CANON KK); | [A]DE10321501 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | by applicant | JP2005286940 | JP2005284203 |