EP2578770 - Floor structure comprising a parquet cover [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Str. 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | For all designated states Construction Research & Technology GmbH Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 83308 Trostberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Jörg Starenweg 4 a 86420 Diedorf / DE | [2013/15] | Application number, filing date | 12193783.3 | 22.11.2012 | [2013/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2578770 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/04, C08G18/28 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
C08G65/336 (EP,US);
C08G18/289 (EP);
C09J171/02 (EP);
C08F230/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bodenaufbau umfassend einen parkettbelag | [2013/15] | English: | Floor structure comprising a parquet cover | [2013/15] | French: | Montage de sol comprenant un revêtement en parquet | [2013/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 20.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102010034997 (STAUF KLEBSTOFFWERK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0046] * * example - *; | [A]DE102005021017 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0021] - [0066] * * examples B1-B18 *; | [A]WO2008145458 (CONSTR RES & TECH GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * page 2, line 9 - page 9, line 12 * * examples 1-63 * | [X] - PCI Augsburg GmbH, "Die neue wasserdichte Systemlösung von PCI", (20121026), URL: http://www.fair-news.de/pressemitteilung-662179.html, (20130226), XP002692844 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - PCI Augsburg GmbH, "PCI Pecilastic W Produktinformation 544", (200611), URL: http://www.fliesen-lerche.de/downloads/pecilasticw.pdf, (20130226), XP002692845 [A] 9-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5364955 | WO2008027463 | - MACROMOLECULES, (2004), vol. 37, pages 4038 - 4043 |