EP2596915 - Impact element for controlled impact rescue tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYTHEON COMPANY 870 Winter Street Waltham MA 02451-1449 / US | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giraldo, Luis 8350 Alban Road Suite 700, Springfield VA 22150 Fairfax VA / US | 02 /
Dolgin, Benjamin 8350 Alban Road Suite 700, Springfield VA 22150 Alexandria VA / US | 03 /
Ryan, John 8350 Alban Road Suite 700, Springfield VA 22150 Fairfax VA / US | 04 /
Millspaugh, Michael 8350 Alban Road Suite 700, Springfield VA 22150 Burke VA / US | 05 /
Dezelick, Edward 8350 Alban Road Suite 700, Springfield VA 22150 Germantown MD / US | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12193902.9 | 22.11.2012 | [2013/22] | Priority number, date | US201113303645 | 23.11.2011 Original published format: US201113303645 | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2596915 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B25D9/02, B25D9/11, B25D17/02, A62B3/00, E04G23/08 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
B25D9/02 (EP,US);
A62B3/005 (EP,US);
B25D17/02 (EP,US);
B25D9/11 (EP,US);
B25D2250/051 (EP,US);
B25D2250/211 (EP,US);
B25D2250/361 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aufschlagelement für Rettungswerkzeug mit kontrolliertem Aufschlag | [2013/22] | English: | Impact element for controlled impact rescue tool | [2013/22] | French: | Élément d'impact d'outil de sauvetage à impact contrôlé | [2013/22] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 17.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0238957 (ZEPF HANS RUDOLF) [A] 1-16 * column 3, lines 41-47; figures 3,4 *; | [YA]US4850437 (SUDNISHNIKOV VADIM B [SU], et al) [Y] 6,15 * column 3, lines 15-16; figures 1-2 * [A] 1-5,7-14,16; | [A]US5730021 (JOHNSON BRYAN T [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 1, lines 23-30; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US5884978 (BELL RICHARD A [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * column 3, lines 20-38; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6257673 (MARKHAM DAVID J [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 4, lines 36-47; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2009199613 (KRUMREI DAVID T [US]) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0037] - [0048]; figures 1A-3E *; | [AD]US7814822 (BRENNAN MIKE [US], et al) [AD] 1-16* the whole document * | by applicant | US7814822 |