EP2562572 - Fabrication of pellicle beam splitters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | 20.05.2016 | Change - applicant | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yeo, Jong-Souk 1000 NE Circle Blvd. Corvallis, OR 97330-4239 / US | 02 /
Mathai, Sagi 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304-1100 / US | 03 /
Tan, Michael 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94304-1100 / US | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Pratt, Richard Wilson EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12193927.6 | 06.05.2008 | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2562572 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/13, G02B6/35, G02B27/14, G02B27/10 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G02B27/144 (EP,US);
G02B27/1073 (EP,US);
G02B27/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/09] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Pellicle-Strahlteilern | [2013/09] | English: | Fabrication of pellicle beam splitters | [2013/09] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un opercule pelliculaire | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 05.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.02.2016 | 04.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/25] | 04.02.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.02.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08755090.1 / EP2271959 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080755090) is 04.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9609183 (MICRO LITHOGRAPHY INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US5900975 (SUSSMAN MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 17 *; | [A]DE10013261 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1a, 1b, 2, 3a, 3b *; | [A]US6593035 (LEVINSON HARRY J [US], et al) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [I]US2004246591 (KOZLOVSKY WILLIAM J [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0031] *; | [A] - KISHAN GUPTA ET AL, "Micromachined polarization beam splitters for the visible spectrum", IEEE/LEOS INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON OPTICAL MEMS, XX, XX, (20030818), pages 171 - 172, XP008143407 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - RASHEED M A AZZAM AND FADI A MAHMOUD, "Symmetrically coated pellicle beam splitters for dual quarter-wave retardation in reflection and transmission", APPLIED OPTICS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC; US, (20020101), vol. 41, no. 1, ISSN 0003-6935, pages 235 - 238, XP008143416 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |