EP2596838 - Golf swing instructional device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hatton, Stephen Mutschellenstrasse 13 5454 Bellikon / CH | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Liebetanz, Michael Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 12194285.8 | 26.11.2012 | [2013/22] | Priority number, date | EP20110190775 | 25.11.2011 Original published format: EP 11190775 | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2596838 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/00, A63B69/36 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
A63B69/0057 (EP,US);
A63B69/3632 (EP,US);
A63B69/3685 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anweisungsvorrichtung für einen Golfschläger | [2013/22] | English: | Golf swing instructional device | [2013/22] | French: | Dispositif de démonstration de swing de golf | [2013/22] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 26.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/46] | 22.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5976024 (MARSHALL JR ROGER LAWRENCE [US]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 45; figure - * [I] 2-13; | [A]WO2006093988 (CONSISTENT SWING LLC [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9322009 (JOHNSON KENNETH E [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US6416419 (FORESI TONY [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5203568 | US5470073 | US6805640 | US4145054 | US6251025 | WO2006093988 | WO9322009 | US6416419 | US5976024 |