EP2738213 - Polyethylene composition having high swell ratio [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Polyolefine GmbH Brühler Strasse 60 50389 Wesseling / DE | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vittorias, Iakovos Zum Schollberg 4 55129 Mainz / DE | 02 /
Wiesecke, Jens Karolingerweg 11 69123 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Marczinke, Bernd Lothar Hinter der Kirche 4 67354 Römerberg / DE | 04 /
Meier, Gerhardus Eichendorffstrasse 3 60320 Frankfurt / DE | 05 /
Schueller, Ulf Gräfstrasse 80 60486 Frankfurt/M / DE | 06 /
Dolle, Volker Wolfsgartenstr. 27 64625 Bensheim / DE | 07 /
Enderle, Johannes-Friedrich Töplitzstrasse 6 60596 Frankfurt / DE | 08 /
Lilge, Dieter Max-Planck-Strasse 7 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 09 /
Gall, Barbara Schöblstr. 8 89312 Günzburg / DE | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Gaverini, Gaetano Luigi Attilio Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Intellectual Property P.le Donegani, 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | Application number, filing date | 12194530.7 | 28.11.2012 | [2014/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2738213 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/08, B29C49/00 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP);
C08L23/0815 (EP);
C08L2205/025 (EP);
C08L2308/00 (EP);
C08L2314/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L23/06, C08L2314/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Polyethylenzusammensetzung mit hohem Schwellverhältnis | [2014/23] | English: | Polyethylene composition having high swell ratio | [2014/23] | French: | Composition de polyéthylène ayant un rapport de gonflement élevé | [2014/23] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2012 | Examination requested [2014/23] | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 14.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2005019280 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1-11 * example 6; table 5 *; | [AD]US6201078 (BREULET JACQUES [BE], et al) [AD] 1-11 * example 7 * | by applicant | US6201078 | US4298718 | US4495338 | US4469648 | US4399054 | WO9844009 | US5100849 | US4829034 | EP0395083 | WO2004106388 | WO9412568 | WO2005019280 | - D. GELDART, Gas Fluidisation Technology, J. WILEY & SONS LTD., (1986), page 155 | - BENOIT H.; REMPP P.; GRUBISIC Z., J. POLYMER SCI., PHYS. ED., (1967), vol. 5, page 753 | - WO DL; TANNER RI, "The impact of blue organic and inorganic pigments on the crystallization and rheological properties of isotactic polypropylene", RHEOL. ACTA, (2010), vol. 49, page 75 | - DERAKHSHANDEH M.; HATZIKIRIAKOS S. G., "Flow-induced crystallization of high-density polyethylene: the effects ofshear and uniaxial extension", RHEOL. ACTA, (2012), vol. 51, doi:doi:10.1007/s00397-011-0605-7, pages 315 - 327, XP035036101 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00397-011-0605-7 | - ZIMM BH; STOCKMAYER WH, "The dimensions of chain molecules containing branches and rings", J CHEM PHYS, (1949), page 17 | - PALZA H.; NAUE 1. F. C.; WILHELM M.; FILIPE S.; BECKER A.; SUNDER J.; GOTTFERT A., "On-Line Detection of Polymer Melt Flow Instabilities in a Capillary Rheometer", KGK. KAUTSCHUK, GUMMI, KUNSTSTOFFE, (2010), vol. 63, no. L0, pages 456 - 461 | - SUSANA FILIPE; IAKOVOS VITTORIAS; MANFRED WILHELM, "Experimental Correlation between Mechanical Non-Linearity in LAOS Flow and Capillary Flow Instabilities for Linear and Branched Commercial Polyethylenes", MACROMOL. MAT. AND ENG., (2008), vol. 293, no. 1, pages 57 - 65 | - GOTTFERT, A.; SUNDER, J., AIP CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, (2008), vol. 1027, pages 1195 - 1197 | - M. FLEISSNER, KUNSTSTOFFE, (1987), vol. 77, page 45 |