EP2737809 - Beverage containing amino acids, suitable for use in the prevention and treatment of mental disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MüMed Bäckerstr. 4 81241 München / DE | [2014/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindermüller, Dr. Anton Am Steinberg 7 82237 Wörthsee / DE | 02 /
Reitzle, Dr. Karl Aiblingerstr. 2 80639 München / DE | [2014/23] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12195226.1 | 03.12.2012 | [2014/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2737809 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/304, A23L1/305, A23L2/52, A61K31/405, A61K31/4415, A61K31/198 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/198 (EP);
A23L2/52 (EP);
A23L33/16 (EP);
A23L33/175 (EP);
A61K31/405 (EP);
A61K31/4172 (EP);
A61K31/4415 (EP);
A61K33/06 (EP);
A61K33/26 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/405, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4172, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/4415, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/06, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/26, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/30, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/322, A23V2250/0606, A23V2250/0624, A23V2250/0638, A23V2250/065, A23V2250/0652, A23V2250/1578, A23V2250/1592, A23V2250/161, A23V2250/1642, A23V2250/7042, A23V2250/7044, A23V2250/7052, A23V2250/7054, A23V2250/706, A23V2250/708, A23V2250/71 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Aminosäurehaltiges Getränk, geeignet zur Verwendung in der Prophylaxe und Behandlung von psychischen Störungen | [2014/23] | English: | Beverage containing amino acids, suitable for use in the prevention and treatment of mental disorders | [2014/23] | French: | Boisson contenant des acides aminés, appropriée à une utilisation dans la prophylaxie et le traitement de perturbations physiques | [2014/23] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/50] | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2017 | 31.12.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009155585 (KENNETH BLUMY [US], et al) [X] 1,12-15 * claims 22, 24,28 * [I] 2-11; | [XI]WO0126642 (BECHTHOLD JOYCE CORINNE [US], et al) [X] 1,12-15 * examples 1, 6,10; claims 1,92 * [I] 2-11; | [XI]US2006062859 (BLUM KENNETH [US], et al) [X] 1,12-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [ 514]; claims 40,47,86 * [I] 2-11; | [XI]US6132724 (BLUM KENNETH [US]) [X] 1,12-15 * claim 1; table 7 * [I] 2-11; | [I]US6955873 (BLUM KENNETH [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0221] , [ 254] , [0276]; example 2; claim 1; tables 10,27,28 *; | [A]WO03079886 (HINZ MARTIN C [US]) [A] 1-15 * examples 1-29 * | by applicant | WO2011120969 | DE102007030495 | DE102005006241 | US6261589 | EP2095728 | - EISENBERG ET AL., J. CLIN. PSYCHIATRY, (1988), vol. 49, page 195 | - HOSHINO ET AL., FOLIA PSYCHIATRY NEUROL. JPN., (1985), vol. 39, page 531 | - BORNSTEIN ET AL., PSYCHIATRY RES., (1990), vol. 33, page 301 | - BAKER ET AL., BIOL. PSYCHIATRY, (1991), vol. 29, page 15 | - ZAVALA ET AL., REV. NEUROBIOL., (2001), vol. 33, page 401 | - SHEKIM ET AL., PSYCHOPHARMACOI. BULL., (1990), vol. 26, page 249 | - VAN OUDHEUSDEN; SCHOLTE, PROSTAGLANDINS, (2002), vol. 67, page 33 |