EP2740820 - Electrolyte and process for the separation of solderable layers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing. Max Schlötter GmbH & Co. KG Talgraben 30 73312 Geislingen / DE | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wohlfarth, Volker Albweg 6 73569 Eschach / DE | 02 /
Jordan, Manfred, Dr. Panoramastr. 36 73084 Salach / DE | [2014/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12195435.8 | 04.12.2012 | [2014/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2740820 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C25D3/60 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
C25D3/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrolyt und Verfahren zur Abscheidung von lötbaren Schichten | [2014/24] | English: | Electrolyte and process for the separation of solderable layers | [2014/24] | French: | Electrolyte et procédé de séparation de couches pouvant être soudées | [2014/24] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2012 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 10.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 28.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5282953 (GERNON MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 1, lines 9-14 * * column 4, lines 27-33,51-55, * * column 4, line 63 - column 5, line 6; examples 8,9; claims 1,15,17,21 *; | [X]US5759381 (SAKURAI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 1, lines 6-38 * * column 2, lines 1-14,46-59 * * column 3, lines 18-31,46-52 * * column 4, lines 14-19 * * column 5, lines 26-40; example 1; tables 1, No. 2, 7 * * example Comp. Ex.; tables 4, No. c *; | [X]JP2001011687 (NE CHEMCAT CORP) [X] 1-6 * the whole document * * abstract *; | [X]US2006113006 (MASUDA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0069] - [0072]; example 12 *; | [X]JP2002339095 (SCHLOETTER FA DR ING MAX) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * * abstract * | by applicant | US5487824 | US6193858 | US6911138 | US2011308960 | US2011259754 | US8083922 | EP2141261 | DE1246346 | - MANFRED JORDAN, Die galvanische Abscheidung von Zinn und Zinnlegierungen, EUGEN G. LEUZE-VERLAG, (1993), page 83 |