EP2740947 - Attachment system with detachable retaining plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EJOT Baubefestigungen GmbH In der Stockwiese 35 57334 Bad Laasphe / DE | [2016/40] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states EJOT Baubefestigungen GmbH In der Stockwiese 35 57302 Bad Berleburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hackler, Erhard Am Winterscheid 7 57319 Bad Berleburg / DE | [2014/24] | Representative(s) | Hohgardt, Martin Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Breite Strasse 27 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/24] | Application number, filing date | 12195622.1 | 05.12.2012 | [2014/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2740947 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2740947 | Date: | 22.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16B13/04, E04B1/76 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
E04B1/7633 (EP);
F16B13/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/25] |
Former [2014/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Befestigungssystem mit entkoppelbarem Halteteller | [2014/24] | English: | Attachment system with detachable retaining plate | [2014/24] | French: | Système de fixation avec disque de maintien pouvant être découplé | [2014/24] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 11.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2012 | AL | 22.06.2016 | BG | 22.06.2016 | CY | 22.06.2016 | DK | 22.06.2016 | EE | 22.06.2016 | ES | 22.06.2016 | FI | 22.06.2016 | HR | 22.06.2016 | LT | 22.06.2016 | LV | 22.06.2016 | MC | 22.06.2016 | MK | 22.06.2016 | MT | 22.06.2016 | RO | 22.06.2016 | RS | 22.06.2016 | SI | 22.06.2016 | SM | 22.06.2016 | NO | 22.09.2016 | GR | 23.09.2016 | IS | 22.10.2016 | PT | 24.10.2016 | CZ | 05.12.2016 | GB | 05.12.2016 | IE | 05.12.2016 | IT | 05.12.2016 | LU | 05.12.2016 | PL | 05.12.2016 | SK | 05.12.2016 | TR | 05.12.2016 | SE | 06.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | NL | 01.01.2017 | FR | 02.01.2017 | [2024/42] |
Former [2018/46] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
AL | 22.06.2016 | ||
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
MT | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
IT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
PL | 05.12.2016 | ||
SK | 05.12.2016 | ||
SE | 06.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
NL | 01.01.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
MT | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
IT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
PL | 05.12.2016 | ||
SK | 05.12.2016 | ||
SE | 06.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
NL | 01.01.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
BG | 22.06.2016 | ||
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
IT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
PL | 05.12.2016 | ||
SK | 05.12.2016 | ||
SE | 06.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
NL | 01.01.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
CY | 22.06.2016 | ||
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
IT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
PL | 05.12.2016 | ||
SK | 05.12.2016 | ||
SE | 06.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
NL | 01.01.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
DK | 22.06.2016 | ||
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
MK | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
IT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
PL | 05.12.2016 | ||
SK | 05.12.2016 | ||
SE | 06.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
NL | 01.01.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
IT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
PL | 05.12.2016 | ||
SK | 05.12.2016 | ||
SE | 06.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
NL | 01.01.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
IT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
SK | 05.12.2016 | ||
SE | 06.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
NL | 01.01.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
IT | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
SK | 05.12.2016 | ||
SE | 06.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
NL | 01.01.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
SE | 06.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
NL | 01.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
MC | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
SE | 06.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SI | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | DK | 22.06.2016 | |
EE | 22.06.2016 | ||
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | EE | 22.06.2016 | |
ES | 22.06.2016 | ||
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
SM | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
PT | 24.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 22.06.2016 | |
FI | 22.06.2016 | ||
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RO | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
IS | 22.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
GR | 23.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
HR | 22.06.2016 | ||
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
LV | 22.06.2016 | ||
RS | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 22.06.2016 | |
LT | 22.06.2016 | ||
NO | 22.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 22.06.2016 | |
NO | 22.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1857607 (FISCHER ARTUR WERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4-7,9,10,13 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021]; figures 2-4 * [I] 2,3,8,11,12; | [AD]EP1318250 (EJOT KUNSTSTOFFTECH GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1318250 |