EP2613444 - Elektronisches Audio-/Videogerät, insbesondere Multimedia-Autoradio mit abnehmbarer Bedienkonsole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parrot 174 quai de Jemmapes 75010 Paris / FR | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sanlaville, Thierry 4, rue Vasco De Gama 75015 PARIS / FR | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique Bardehle Pagenberg 10, boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12195671.8 | 05.12.2012 | [2013/28] | Priority number, date | FR20120050116 | 05.01.2012 Original published format: FR 1250116 | [2013/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2613444 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2613444 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/08 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
H04B1/082 (EP,US);
B60R11/0205 (US);
B60K35/53 (EP,US);
B60K35/10 (EP);
B60K35/22 (EP,US);
H04B2001/084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Title | German: | Audiovisual electronic device, in particular a multimedia car radio, with removable front panel | [2013/28] | English: | Elektronisches Audio-/Videogerät, insbesondere Multimedia-Autoradio mit abnehmbarer Bedienkonsole | [2013/28] | French: | Appareil électronique audio/vidéo, notamment autoradio multimédia, à façade amovible. | [2013/28] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 21.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2012 | AL | 30.04.2014 | AT | 30.04.2014 | CY | 30.04.2014 | CZ | 30.04.2014 | DK | 30.04.2014 | EE | 30.04.2014 | ES | 30.04.2014 | FI | 30.04.2014 | HR | 30.04.2014 | LT | 30.04.2014 | LV | 30.04.2014 | MC | 30.04.2014 | MK | 30.04.2014 | MT | 30.04.2014 | PL | 30.04.2014 | RO | 30.04.2014 | RS | 30.04.2014 | SE | 30.04.2014 | SI | 30.04.2014 | SK | 30.04.2014 | SM | 30.04.2014 | TR | 30.04.2014 | BG | 30.07.2014 | NO | 30.07.2014 | GR | 31.07.2014 | IS | 30.08.2014 | PT | 01.09.2014 | IE | 05.12.2014 | LU | 05.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MK | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
TR | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 05.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
SM | 30.04.2014 | ||
TR | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 05.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
MT | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
TR | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 05.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.12.2012 | |
AT | 30.04.2014 | ||
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 05.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
MC | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 05.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
IE | 05.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SI | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RO | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
EE | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
SK | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
DK | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
PT | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
RS | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 30.04.2014 | |
CY | 30.04.2014 | ||
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
ES | 30.04.2014 | ||
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
HR | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
LV | 30.04.2014 | ||
PL | 30.04.2014 | ||
SE | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
FI | 30.04.2014 | ||
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
NO | 30.07.2014 | ||
IS | 30.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 30.04.2014 | |
LT | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 30.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19825790 (BECKER GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP1950094 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]); | [AD]EP2184860 (PARROT [FR]) | by applicant | EP2184860 | EP2329990 |