EP2610880 - TEMPERATURE-RESISTANT HALOGEN-FREE CABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/27] | Temperature-resistant halogen-free cable | ||
[2015/51] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2016 [2016/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 8, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Calvo González, Encarnación Cellastrasse 17 91126 Schwabach / DE | 02 /
Dinkelmeyer, Christof Zollernstrasse 19 91207 Lauf / DE | 03 /
Munoz, Uriel Fernando Hernando de Magallanes 1042 dptp. 1003 9650000 Las Condes / CL | 04 /
Silva, Luis Ernesto Carrera 25 n[deg] 36-34 Apto. 201 Torre A Canaveral Floridablanca-Santander / CO | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Feray, Valérie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 12195698.1 | 05.12.2012 | [2013/27] | Priority number, date | EP20110306665 | 15.12.2011 Original published format: EP 11306665 | [2013/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2610880 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01B7/295, H01B7/29, H01B13/00 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
H01B7/295 (EP,US);
H01B7/292 (US);
H01B13/00 (US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/27] | H01B7/295, H01B7/29 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERATURBESTÄNDIGES HALOGENFREIES KABEL | [2015/51] | English: | TEMPERATURE-RESISTANT HALOGEN-FREE CABLE | [2015/51] | French: | CÂBLE SANS HALOGÈNE RÉSISTANT À LA TEMPÉRATURE | [2015/51] |
Former [2013/27] | Temperaturbeständiges halogenfreies Kabel | ||
Former [2013/27] | Temperature-resistant halogen-free cable | ||
Former [2013/27] | Câble sans halogène résistant à la température | Examination procedure | 03.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 15.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/41] | 12.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0440118 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 * example 14; table 3 * * paragraph [0011] * * figures 1,3,4,6 * * claims 1,2,4,5,8,9,12-16 * * the whole document * [I] 10,11; | [XI]JPH0512924 (FUJIKURA LTD) [X] 1-9 * working example * * claims 1,4,8,9 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraphs [0027] , [0033] - [0040] - [0046] - [0052] * * figures 1,3,4,6 * * table 1 * * example 14; table 3 * * the whole document * [I] 10,11; | [XI]US5358786 (ISHIKAWA IZUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * claims 1-3 * * column 3 - column 4 * * figures 1,2,3,4,6 * * the whole document * [I] 11; | [XI]US5521009 (ISHIKAWA IZUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [I] 10,11; | [XAI]WO9741569 (CABLE SYSTEMS INTERNATIONAL IN [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8 * claims 4,5,10,24,28,35 * [A] 3,5,6,10 [I] 11; | [A]GB2324194 (PLASTIC INSULATED CABLES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-11 * claim 1 * * the whole document *; | [A]EP1102282 (STUDER AG DRAHT & KABELWERK [CH]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [I]JP2002133952 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, et al) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2002140941 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * the whole document * [I] 10,11; | [A]DE20122775U (DRAKA COMTEQ BERLIN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]EP1990808 (JJI TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) [A] 1-11 * claims 1,2,5 *; | [A] - "Melamine cyanurate", (20110512), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Melamine_cyanurate&oldid=428736138, (20120425), XP055025575 [A] 10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5358786 | US5521009 | WO9741569 |