EP2740467 - Pumpable cosmetic composition with a high humectant content and foaming properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/49] | For all designated states Clariant International AG Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states OTC GmbH Brammenring 11 46047 Oberhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fiebrig, Benjamin Klosterhardter Str. 45A 46119 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
Dahms, Gerd Koopmannstrasse 59a 47138 Duisburg / DE | [2016/10] |
Former [2015/18] | 01 /
Fiebrig, Benjamin Klosterhardter Str. 45A 46119 Oberhausen / DE | ||
02 /
Dahms, Gerd. Koopmannstrasse 59a 47138 Duisburg / DE | |||
Former [2014/24] | 01 /
Fiebrig, Benjamin Klosterhardter Str. 45A 46119 Oberhausen / DE | Representative(s) | Holmes, Rosalind, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12196302.9 | 10.12.2012 | [2014/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2740467 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/34, A61Q9/02, A61K8/04 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
A61K8/345 (EP);
A61K8/046 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K8/44 (EP);
A61K8/466 (EP);
A61K8/645 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61Q9/02 (EP);
A61K2800/262 (EP);
A61K2800/88 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pumpfähige kosmetische Zusammensetzung mit einem Befeuchtungsgehalt und Schäumungseigenschaften | [2014/24] | English: | Pumpable cosmetic composition with a high humectant content and foaming properties | [2014/24] | French: | Composition cosmétique pompable avec un contenu humectant élevé et des propriétés de moussage | [2014/24] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 13.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 22.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003053961 (ECCARD WAYNE ELLIS [US]) [X] 1-3,7-11,13,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] - paragraph [0131]; examples 1-10; claim - * [Y] 5,6; | [XY]EP1736141 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-4,8-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0045]; example 1; claim - * [Y] 5,6; | [XY]WO9951716 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11,13,15 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 22; examples 18,20,23 * * page 19, line 18 - page 33, line 2 * * page 1, line 3 - line 5 * [Y] 5,6; | [XY]US2008292560 (TAMARKIN DOV [IL], et al) [X] 1-4,8-15 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0321]; examples 5-7 * * paragraph [0412] - paragraph [0415] * * paragraph [0434] - paragraph [0451] * * paragraph [0857] - paragraph [0912] * [Y] 5,6; | [Y]US5167950 (LINS CLAUDIO L K [US]) [Y] 5 * column 6, line 14 - column 8, line 13 *; | [Y]WO0200176 (REVLON CONSUMER PROD CORP [US]) [Y] 6 * page 21, line 14 - line 22; example 1 *; | [Y]EP2236127 (ROTTAPHARM SPA [IT]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0016] * | [A] - "Cocoyl glutamic acid", (20121130), URL: http://www.saael.com/en/saa/?type=detail&id=4575, (20130508), XP055062391 [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2010069505 | DE102006001755 |