EP2570583 - Earth-boring bits and other parts including cemented carbide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kennametal Inc. 1600 Technology Way Latrobe, PA 15650-0231 / US | [2014/36] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states TDY Industries, LLC 1000 Six PPG Place Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15222 / US | ||
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states TDY Industries, Inc. 1000 Six PPG Place Pittsburgh, PA 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mirchandani, Prakash K 11323 Pampass Pass Houston, TX 77095 / US | 02 /
Chandler, Morris E 7926 Avenue C Santa Fe, TX 77510 / US | 03 /
Waller, Michale E 4303 Cloverdale Drive Huntsville Alabama 35805 / US | 04 /
Coleman, Heath C 1275 Greenbriar Cove Road Union Grove, AL 35175 / US | [2013/28] |
Former [2013/25] | 01 /
Mirchandani, Prakash K 11323 Pampass Pass Houston, TX 77095 / US | ||
02 /
Chandler, Morris E 7926 Avenue C Santa Fe, TX 77510 / US | |||
03 /
Waller, Michale E 4303 Cloverdale Drive Huntsville, AL 35805 / US | |||
04 /
Coleman, Heath C 1275 Greenbriar Cove Road Union Grove, AL 35175 / US | |||
Former [2013/20] | 01 /
Mirchandani, Prakash K 11323 Pampass Pass Houston, TX 77095 / US | ||
02 /
Chandler, Morris E 7926 Avenue C Santa Fe, TX 77510 / US | |||
03 /
Waller, Michale E 207 Tara Leigh Drive Huntsville, AL 35811 / US | |||
04 /
Coleman, Heath C 1275 Greenbriar Cove Road Union Grove, AL 35175 / US | |||
Former [2013/12] | 01 /
Mirchandani, Prakash K 11323 Pampass Pass Houston, TX Texas 77095 / US | ||
02 /
Chandler, Morris E 7926 Avenue C Santa Fe, TX Texas 77510 / US | |||
03 /
Waller, Michale E 207 Tara Leigh Drive Huntsville, AL Alabama 35811 / US | |||
04 /
Coleman, Heath C 1275 Greenbriar Cove Road Union Grove, AL Alabama 35175 / US | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2013/12] | Baker, Colin John, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 12196590.9 | 20.07.2009 | [2013/12] | Priority number, date | US20080196815 | 22.08.2008 Original published format: US 196815 | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2570583 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2570583 | Date: | 11.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B10/42, C22C29/00, // B22F3/26, C22C29/08, B22F3/10, B22F5/00 | [2015/46] | CPC: |
E21B10/567 (EP,US);
B22F3/1035 (EP,US);
B22F3/26 (EP,US);
C22C29/08 (EP,US);
B22F2005/001 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12146 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12486 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/12] | E21B10/42, C22C29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Title | German: | Erdbohrbohrer und andere Teile mit zementiertem Carbid | [2013/12] | English: | Earth-boring bits and other parts including cemented carbide | [2013/12] | French: | Trépans de forage du sol et autres parties contenant du carbure cimenté | [2013/12] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/12] | 06.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/43] | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/43] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09790629.1 / EP2326787 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090790629) is 12.04.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005211475 (MIRCHANDANI PRAKASH K [US], et al) [X] 1-35 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0037] ** sentence 9, paragraph 0041 - sentence 12 * | by applicant | US7384443 | US20040848437 | US20050116752 |