EP2620236 - Flow-through mould for the strand casting of a strand, especially with billets or bloom profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2021 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2021 [2021/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2015/24] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Siemens VAI Metals Technologies GmbH Turmstrasse 44 4031 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramstorfer, Franz Schubertgasse 3 2225 Zistersdorf / AT | 02 /
Reisenberger, Ewald Glasau 6 4191 Vorderweißenbach / AT | 03 /
Thoene, Heinrich Lortzinggasse 12 4020 Linz / AT | 04 /
Wimmer, Franz Pomedt 18 4752 Riedau / AT | 05 /
Zanelli, Ugo Via Giulio Cesare 2/F 33010 Tavagnacco / IT | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Metals@Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Maier, Daniel Oliver Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12196675.8 | 12.12.2012 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | AT20120050014 | 30.01.2012 Original published format: AT 500142012 | [2013/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2620236 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2620236 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/041, B22D11/043, B22D11/055 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
B22D11/041 (EP,AT);
B22D11/055 (EP,AT);
B22D11/04 (AT);
B22D11/043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2013/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Durchlaufkokille zum Stranggießen eines Strangs, insbesondere mit Knüppel- oder Vorblockprofil | [2013/31] | English: | Flow-through mould for the strand casting of a strand, especially with billets or bloom profile | [2013/31] | French: | Lingotière de passage pour la coulée d'une barre, notamment avec profilés de blooms ou de billettes | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 07.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/43] | 09.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008148465 (CONCAST AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9,10,12-15 * page 2 - page 12 * * figures 1-13 *; | [Y]DE2914385 (SIDERURGIE FSE INST RECH) [Y] 1-15 * page 8 - page 18 * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]EP1468760 (CONCAST AG [CH]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE4496208 (WURTH PAUL SA [LU]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4318105 (CONCAST STANDARD AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE102005059712 (KM EUROPA METAL AG [DE]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1013361 (KM EUROPA METAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3411359 (MANNESMANN AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004148323 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003311377 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1792676 (KM EUROPA METAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |