EP2605375 - Stator for an electric motor and method for manufacturing a stator for an electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metabowerke GmbH Metabo-Allee 1 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmohl, Michael Tulpenweg 4 72119 Ammerbuch / DE | 02 /
Flöte, Enrico Albstrasse 48 72636 Frickenhausen-Linsenhofen / DE | 03 /
Ebner, Felix Zeppelinstrasse 15 73033 Göppingen / DE | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Markus Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Straße 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2019/25] |
Former [2013/25] | Lorenz, Markus Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Straße 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12196987.7 | 13.12.2012 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | DE20111088518 | 14.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011088518 | [2013/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2605375 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2605375 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2605375 | Date: | 19.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/32, H02K15/12, H02K3/38 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
H02K15/12 (EP);
H02K3/325 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/25] | H02K3/32, H02K15/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/10] |
Former [2013/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Stator für einen Elektromotor sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Stators für einen Elektromotor | [2013/25] | English: | Stator for an electric motor and method for manufacturing a stator for an electric motor | [2013/25] | French: | Stator pour un moteur électrique et procédé de fabrication d'un stator pour un moteur électrique | [2013/25] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/10] | 25.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2019 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2012 | AL | 19.06.2019 | CY | 19.06.2019 | CZ | 19.06.2019 | DK | 19.06.2019 | EE | 19.06.2019 | ES | 19.06.2019 | FI | 19.06.2019 | HR | 19.06.2019 | IT | 19.06.2019 | LT | 19.06.2019 | LV | 19.06.2019 | MC | 19.06.2019 | MK | 19.06.2019 | MT | 19.06.2019 | NL | 19.06.2019 | PL | 19.06.2019 | RO | 19.06.2019 | RS | 19.06.2019 | SE | 19.06.2019 | SI | 19.06.2019 | SK | 19.06.2019 | SM | 19.06.2019 | TR | 19.06.2019 | BG | 19.09.2019 | NO | 19.09.2019 | GR | 20.09.2019 | IS | 19.10.2019 | PT | 21.10.2019 | AT | 13.12.2019 | IE | 13.12.2019 | LU | 13.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
MT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
AT | 13.12.2019 | ||
IE | 13.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AL | 19.06.2019 | ||
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
AT | 13.12.2019 | ||
IE | 13.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CY | 19.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
AT | 13.12.2019 | ||
IE | 13.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 13.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IE | 13.12.2019 | ||
LU | 13.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
MC | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SI | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
PL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
DK | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
TR | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
SM | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
IT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
IS | 19.10.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
EE | 19.06.2019 | ||
ES | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
SK | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RO | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
PT | 21.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
CZ | 19.06.2019 | ||
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
NL | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
BG | 19.09.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
LV | 19.06.2019 | ||
RS | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
GR | 20.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 19.06.2019 | |
FI | 19.06.2019 | ||
HR | 19.06.2019 | ||
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
SE | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 19.06.2019 | |
LT | 19.06.2019 | ||
NO | 19.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1113017 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 6-9,15,16* the whole document *; | [IA]US3904785 (BAUMANN FREDERICK WILLIAM) [I] 1-5,10-14,17 * abstract * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 29 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 61 * * figure 1 * [A] 6-9,15,16; | [IA]US4387311 (KOBAYASHI TSUGUO [JP], et al) [I] 1-5,10-12,14,17 * abstract * * column 3, line 3 - line 44 * * column 11, line 26 - line 41 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 6-9,13,15,16; | [IA]EP0509366 (KRESS ELEKTRIK GMBH & CO [DE]) [I] 1-5,10-12,14,17 * abstract * * column 4, line 34 - column 6, line 48 * * figure 1 * [A] 6-9,13,15,16; | [IA]US2002108566 (BECHERUCCI RAFFAELE [IT], et al) [I] 1-5,10-14,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0056] * * figures 1-8 * [A] 6-9,15,16; | [XAI]US2005073204 (PUTERBAUGH DAVID K [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,11,12,15-17 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0041] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 13 [I] 1,3-5,10,14 |