EP2620800 - Optical unit, illumination optical apparatus, exposure apparatus, and device manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2015/36] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanitsu, Osamu c/o Nikon Corporation 2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12197227.7 | 23.10.2008 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | US20070960996P | 24.10.2007 Original published format: US 960996 P | US20080006446P | 14.01.2008 Original published format: US 6446 P | US20080245021 | 03.10.2008 Original published format: US 245021 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2620800 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2620800 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/09, G02B27/28, // G03F7/20 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
G02B27/0927 (EP,US);
G02B27/09 (KR);
F21V13/02 (EP,US);
F21V14/003 (US);
F21V9/14 (US);
G02B26/0833 (KR);
G02B27/0938 (EP,US);
G02B27/10 (KR);
G02B27/1086 (US);
G02B27/126 (US);
G02B27/286 (EP,US);
G03F7/20 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/31] | G02B27/09, // G03F7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | Optische Einheit, optisches Beleuchtungsgerät, Belichtungsgerät und Geräteherstellungsverfahren | [2013/31] | English: | Optical unit, illumination optical apparatus, exposure apparatus, and device manufacturing method | [2013/31] | French: | Unité optique, appareil dýéclairage optique, appareil dýexposition, et procédé de fabrication de dispositif | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/14] | 20.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/38] | 15.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08841021.2 / EP2203778 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080841021) is 08.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1826616 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0027] , [0033] - [0037] - [0042]; figures 1,2,3a,3b.5a.5b *; | [Y]WO2007100081 (NIKON CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0016] - [0023] - [0025] , [0026] , [0035] , [0059]; figure 1 *; | EP1993120 [ ] (NIKON CORP [JP]) [ ] * abstract *; | [Y]WO2005026843 (ZEISS CARL SMT AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0040] - [0043]; figures 2,3 * | by applicant | JP2002353105 | JPH10503300 | EP0779530 | JP2004078136 | US6900915 | JP2006524349 | US7095546 | JP2006113437 | JP2005077819 | US7116478 | JPH06281869 | US5312513 | JP2004520618 | US6885493 | JP2006513442 | US6891655 | JP2005524112 | US2005095749 | US5229872 | JP2005005521 | JP2006054328 | JP2003022967 | US2003038225 | JP2004304135 | WO2006080285 | US2007296936 | WO9949504 | JPH06124873 | JPH10303114 |