EP2724803 - PCD milling cutter for lens processing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cha, In-Sun No. B-603, Yaksu Mansion 211-1 Sangdo 4-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-841 / KR | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cha, In-Sun B-603, Yaksu Mansion, 211-1 Sangdo 4-dong Dongjak-gu 156-841 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Cha, Soo-II 102-306, Gyeongnam Honorsville Apt.l, 512 Daebang-dong, Dongjak-gu 156-020 Seoul / KR | 03 /
Jang, Dong-Bin 1301-601, Hyundai Hillstate Apt., Guwol-dong Namdong-gu 405-220 Incheon / KR | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/18] | Application number, filing date | 12197581.7 | 17.12.2012 | [2014/18] | Priority number, date | KR20120119662 | 26.10.2012 Original published format: KR 20120119662 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2724803 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2724803 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/10, B23C5/18 | [2015/47] | CPC: |
B23C5/1081 (EP,KR,US);
B23C5/14 (KR,US);
B23C5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2210/084 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2226/315 (EP,KR,US);
B23C2240/08 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T407/1946 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/18] | B23C5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] |
Former [2014/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PKD-Fräser zur Brillenglasbearbeitung | [2018/51] | English: | PCD milling cutter for lens processing | [2014/18] | French: | Fraise à PCD pour usinage de verre de lunettes | [2018/51] |
Former [2014/18] | PKD-Fräser zur Brillenglasverarbeitung | ||
Former [2014/18] | Fraise à fileter PCD pour traitement de lentilles | Examination procedure | 29.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 20.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH08141817 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP3692256B (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES; NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1,3,4* figures 1,7,8 *; | [Y]DE202009005460U (GRUPPE MATZDORF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-5 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraphs 20-21 * * page 6; claim 1 * * page 7; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP2226143 (SCHNEIDER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * | by applicant | KR0177286B |