EP2613006 - Turbine assembly and method for reducing fluid flow between turbine components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Babu, Ramesh Kempanna John F. Welch Technology Centre Pvt. Ltd. Plot 122, EPIP Phase II, Hoodi Village Whitefield Road 560066 Bangalore / IN | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2013/28] | Application number, filing date | 12197661.7 | 18.12.2012 | [2013/28] | Priority number, date | US201213343145 | 04.01.2012 Original published format: US201213343145 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2613006 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/00, F01D11/04, F01D11/06, F01D25/12 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
F01D11/04 (EP,US);
F01D11/06 (EP,US);
F01D25/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Turbinenanordnung und Verfahren zur Verringerung der Flüssigkeitströmung zwischen Turbinenkomponenten | [2013/28] | English: | Turbine assembly and method for reducing fluid flow between turbine components | [2013/28] | French: | Ensemble de turbine et procédé permettant de réduire l'écoulement de fluide entre des composants de turbine | [2013/28] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 01.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002159880 (MORRIS MARK C [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-4; claims 1,4,7 *; | [X]US2010008760 (MORRIS MARK C [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0032]; figures 1-3; claims 1, 12-15 *; | [X]US2011193293 (MEGA DIMITRI D V [GB], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052]; figures 1, 9,10; claim 1 * |