EP2607947 - Display apparatus with an electromagnetic wave shielding structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Woong Hee 107-1004, Jugong-greenville Apt., Matan-3-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kan, Woo Young 203-503, Hyojachon-Donga Apt., Seohyeon-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Doo Soon 106-1804, Daemyoung-lakevill Apt., Yeongdeok-dong Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Jung, Sung Soo 303-1206, LG-Dongsuwon Xii, Mangpo-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Jung, Hyun Jun 108-1801, SK Apt., 700, Seocheon-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Clark, David James Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 12197814.2 | 18.12.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | KR20110140113 | 22.12.2011 Original published format: KR 20110140113 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2607947 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2607947 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1333, H01J11/44, H05K9/00 | [2014/23] | CPC data not yet available |
Former IPC [2013/26] | G02F1/1333 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung mit elektromagnetischer Wellenabschirmstruktur | [2013/26] | English: | Display apparatus with an electromagnetic wave shielding structure | [2013/26] | French: | Appareil d'affichage doté d'une structure de blindage contre les ondes électromagnétiques | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5899549 (NAKANISHI HIDEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 2, line 18 - line 28 * * column 3, line 15 - line 54 * * column 4, line 12 - line 31; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]JPH09269480 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [X] 1,2,5,7 * abstract * [I] 4,6; | [XI]EP1993336 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,5,7,9 * paragraphs [0041] - [0045]; figure 7 * [I] 10,11; | [XI]US6160349 (NAGAI TAKAYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,9 * column 5, line 28 - line 33 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 12 * * column 7, line 58 - column 8, line 6; figure 7 * [I] 6,8 |