EP2746299 - Multistage process for the polymerization of ethylene [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2015 [2015/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. Via Soperga, 14/A 20127 Milano / IT | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maus, Andreas Pfungststrasse 11 60314 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
Meier, Gerhardus Eichendorffstrasse 3 60320 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
Collina, Gianni c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. P.le Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | 04 /
Brita, Diego c/o Basell Poliolefine Italia S.r.l. P.le Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Giberti, Stefano c/o Basell Polioefine Italia s.r.l. Intellectual property dept. P.le Donegani 12 44122 Ferrara / IT | [2014/26] | Application number, filing date | 12198087.4 | 19.12.2012 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2746299 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/02, C08F2/00, C08F2/14 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
C08F2/14 (EP,US);
C08F110/02 (US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/02, C08F2/001 (EP,US);
C08F10/02, C08F2/14 (US,EP);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/07, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/14 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mehrstufiges Verfahren zur Polymerisierung von Ethylen | [2014/26] | English: | Multistage process for the polymerization of ethylene | [2014/26] | French: | Procédé en plusieurs étapes pour la polymérisation d'éthylène | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/28] | 03.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0395083 (HIMONT INC [US]) [AD] 1-10* claim - *; | [Y]EP0476432 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * claim -; table - *; | [A]WO2007147714 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 13 - line 17 * * page 14, line 13 - line 26 * * page - *; | [X]WO2009037080 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 3 * * claim - *; | [YD]WO2010097305 (BASELL POLYOLEFINE GMBH [DE], et al) [YD] 1-10 * claim - *; | [A]WO2011076669 (BASELL POLIOLEFINE SRL [IT], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 9, line 3 - line 10 * * claim - * | by applicant | US4399054 | US4469648 | US4829034 | EP0395083 | US5100849 | EP0649860 | WO9844009 | WO2010097305 | - Encyclopedia of Chemical Technology, 3rd edition,, vol. 16, page 390 |