EP2746821 - Optical sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leuze electronic GmbH + Co KG In der Braike 1 73277 Owen/Teck / DE | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lohmann Dr., Lutz LAS Rosenstr. 10 82140 Olching / DE | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Ruckh Jurastraße 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Patentanwalt Jurastrasse 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | ||
Former [2014/26] | Ruckh, Rainer Gerhard Jurastrasse 1 73087 Bad Boll / DE | Application number, filing date | 12198346.4 | 20.12.2012 | [2014/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2746821 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2746821 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/22 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
G01V8/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2017/16] |
Former [2014/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Optischer Sensor | [2014/26] | English: | Optical sensor | [2014/26] | French: | Capteur optique | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 03.09.2013 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 12.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE Opponent's representative Rieger, Daniel-Stephan Sick AG Intellectual Property Erwin-Sick-Straße 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch/Breisgau / DE Opponent's representative Rieger, Daniel-Stephan Sick AG Intellectual Property Erwin-Sick-Straße 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | 08.02.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.06.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.05.2019 | 15.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 03.06.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1798577 (SICK AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1168269 (SICK AG [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1512992 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 4a; claim 1 *; | [A]DE202006008112U (SICK AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | Opposition | DE19938639 | DE102006046152 | EP1811427 | DE29520980U | DE19644278 | DE10236244 | DE202006020342U | DE202007001907U | DE202007014313U | US9596451 | WO0241272 | US4652205 | EP1722151 | EP1927957 | DE202006008112U | EP1168269 | EP1512992 | EP1798577 |