EP2746768 - Podxl in bladder cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlas Antibodies AB AlbaNova University Center 106 91 Stockholm / SE | [2014/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jirström, Karin Scaniagatan 26 SE-216 18 Limhamn / SE | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2014/26] | Application number, filing date | 12198437.1 | 20.12.2012 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2746768 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/574 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
G01N33/57434 (EP,US);
G01N33/57407 (US);
A61K39/04 (US);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
G01N33/5091 (EP,US);
G01N33/574 (EP,US);
G01N2333/705 (US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PODXL bei Blasenkrebs | [2014/26] | English: | Podxl in bladder cancer | [2014/26] | French: | Podxl dans le cancer de la vessie | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/31] | 17.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9812564 (DIAGNOCURE INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,12-15 * claims 7-9; tables 4-6 * * page 1, lines 6-12 * * page 4, lines 1-8 * * page 4, lines 26-27 * * page 9, lines 4-20 * * page 10, lines 24-25 * * page 25, lines 7-14 * * page 27, lines 19-23 * [I] 2-11; | [XI]US2006294607 (FITZHUGH WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1,12-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [00 6] , [0 12] , [0 19] , [0 21] , [0 27] , [0 31] , [0 83] , [ 115] , [ 118] * * paragraphs [0206] , [ 220] , [ 267] , [ 385] * [I] 2-11; | [A]EP2452950 (ACTGEN INC [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI] - FRADET Y ET AL, "Strategies of chemoprevention based on antigenic and molecular markers of early and premalignant lesions of the bladder", JOURNAL OF CELLULAR BIOCHEMISTRY. SUPPLEMENT, A.R. LISS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 50, no. Suppl.16I, ISSN 0733-1959, (19920101), pages 85 - 92, (20040219), XP009169177 [X] 1,12-15 * abstract * * page 86, column 1, lines 14-22 * * page 87, column 2, lines 32-36 * * page 87, column 2, lines 45-50 * * page 88, column 1, line 23 - page 88, column 2, line 2 * * page 88, column 2, lines 6-10 * * page 89, column 1, lines 1-4 * * page 89, column 1, lines 17-10 * [I] 2-11 | [A] - GEORG F WEBER*1 ET AL, "Multimodal treatment strategies for locally advanced rectal cancer", EXPERT REVIEW OF ANTICANCER THERAPY,, (20120101), vol. 12, no. 4, doi:10.1586/ERA.12.3, ISSN 1473-7140, pages 481 - 494, XP009169181 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/era.12.3 | by applicant | WO0104144 | WO0105808 | WO2011051288 | - THOMPSON, J.D.; HIGGINS, D.G.; GIBSON, T.J., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 22, pages 4673 - 4680 | - PRALL F, "Tumour budding in colorectal carcinoma", HISTOPATHOLOGY, (2007), vol. 50, no. 1, pages 151 - 162 | - HASE K ET AL., "Prognostic value of tumor ''budding'' in patients with colorectal cancer", DIS COLON RECTUM, (1993), vol. 36, no. 7, pages 627 - 635 | - RHODES ET AL., THE BIOMEDICAL SCIENTIST, (2006), pages 515 - 520 | - NILSSON P ET AL., PROTEOMICS, (2005), vol. 5, pages 4327 - 4337 | - K6HLER G; MILSTEIN C, EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1976), vol. 6, pages 511 - 519 | - SKERRA A; P UCKTHUN A, SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1038 - 1041 | - BIRD RE; WALKER BW, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL, (1991), vol. 9, pages 132 - 137 | - STEVENS FJ ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, pages 6803 - 6805 | - HAMERS-CASTERMAN C ET AL., NATURE, (1993), vol. 363, pages 446 - 448 | - CAI X; GAREN A, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1996), vol. 93, pages 6280 - 6285 | - MASAT L ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1994), vol. 91, pages 893 - 896 | - DOOLEY H ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL, (2003), vol. 40, pages 25 - 33 | - BRADBURY AR; MARKS JD, J. IMMUNOL. METHS., (2004), vol. 290, pages 29 - 49 | - NYGREN PA; SKERRA A, J. IMMUNOL. METHS., (2004), vol. 290, pages 3 - 28 | - GOLD L ET AL., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1995), vol. 64, pages 763 - 797 | - NORD K ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 15, pages 772 - 777 | - BESTE G ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1999), vol. 96, pages 1898 - 1903 | - BINZ HK ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2003), vol. 332, pages 489 - 503 | - SMITH GP ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 277, pages 317 - 332 | - LEHTI6 J ET AL., PROTEINS, (2000), vol. 41, pages 316 - 322 | - PEELLE B ET AL., CHEM. BIOL., (2001), vol. 8, pages 521 - 534 | - HUFTON SE ET AL., FEBS LETT., (2000), vol. 475, pages 225 - 231 | - IRVING RA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (2001), vol. 248, pages 31 - 45 | - WENTZEL A ET AL., J. BACTERIOL., (2001), vol. 183, pages 7273 - 7284 | - BAGGIO R ET AL., J. MOL. RECOGNIT, (2002), vol. 15, pages 126 - 134 | - ROBERTS BL ET AL., GENE, (1992), vol. 121, pages 9 - 15 | - DENNIS MS; LAZARUS RA, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, pages 22137 - 22144 | - SCHNEIDER S ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 170 - 175 | - LU Z ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 13, pages 366 - 372 | - KLEVENZ B ET AL., CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI., (2002), vol. 59, pages 1993 - 1998 | - NORMAN TC ET AL., SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 285, pages 591 - 595 | - MCCONELL SJ; HOESS RH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 250, pages 460 - 479 | - LI R ET AL., PROTEIN ENG., (2003), vol. 16, pages 65 - 72 | - KOIDE A ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1998), vol. 284, pages 1141 - 1151 | - XU L ET AL., CHEM. BIOL., (2002), vol. 9, pages 933 - 942 | - BIANCHI E ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1995), vol. 247, pages 154 - 160 | - KLUG A, J. MOL. BIOL., (1999), vol. 293, pages 215 - 218 | - SEGAL DJ ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 42, pages 2137 - 2148 | - ELLINGTON AD; SZOSTAK JW, NATURE, (1990), vol. 346, pages 818 - 822 | - BRODY EN; GOLD L, J. BIOTECHNOL, (2000), vol. 74, pages 5 - 13 | - MAYER G; JENNE A, BIODRUGS, (2004), vol. 18, pages 351 - 359 | - SMITH GP, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, pages 1315 - 1317 | - HANES J; P UCKTHUN A, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1997), vol. 94, pages 4937 - 4942 | - FIELDS S; SONG 0, NATURE, (1989), vol. 340, pages 245 - 246 | - GAI SA; WITTRUP KD, CURR OPIN STRUCT BIOL, (2007), vol. 17, pages 467 - 473 | - ROBERTS RW; SZOSTAK JW, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1997), vol. 94, pages 12297 - 12302 | - DAUGHERTY PS, CURR OPIN STRUCT BIOL, (2007), vol. 17, pages 474 - 480 | - KRONQVIST N ET AL., PROTEIN ENG DES SEL, (2008), pages 1 - 9 | - HARVEY BR ET AL., PNAS, (2004), vol. 101, no. 25, pages 913 - 9198 | - NORD 0 ET AL., J BIOTECHNOL, (2003), vol. 106, pages 1 - 13 | - TUERK C; GOLD L, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 505 - 510 | - REMY I; MICHNICK SW, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1999), vol. 96, pages 5394 - 5399 | - STRYER L, SCIENCE, (1968), vol. 162, pages 526 - 533 | - BRAND L; GOHLKE JR, ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1972), vol. 41, pages 843 - 868 | - CHAN ET AL., CURR OPI BIOTECH., (2002), vol. 13, pages 40 - 46 | - WENSEL TG; MEARES CF, Radioimmunoimaging and Radioimmunotherapy, ELSEVIER, (1983), pages 185 - 196 |