EP2747052 - Method and apparatus for execution control of output actions in one or more output interfaces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2014/31] |
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomatis, Andrea Residence Le Bel Air Batiment B 1465 Chemin des Combes 06600 Antibes / FR | 02 /
Lan, Lin B 69 17 rue Leon Noel Residence Le Chevreuse 06400 Cannes / FR | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12199343.0 | 24.12.2012 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2747052 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2747052 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0967, G01C21/36 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
G08G1/09675 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ausführung der Steuerung von Ausgabeaktionen in einer oder mehreren Ausgabeschnittstellen | [2014/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for execution control of output actions in one or more output interfaces | [2014/26] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la commande d'exécution d'actions de sortie dans une ou plusieurs interfaces de sortie | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2013 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 09.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.12.2012 | AL | 24.06.2015 | AT | 24.06.2015 | BE | 24.06.2015 | CY | 24.06.2015 | CZ | 24.06.2015 | DK | 24.06.2015 | EE | 24.06.2015 | ES | 24.06.2015 | FI | 24.06.2015 | HR | 24.06.2015 | IT | 24.06.2015 | LT | 24.06.2015 | LV | 24.06.2015 | MC | 24.06.2015 | MK | 24.06.2015 | MT | 24.06.2015 | NL | 24.06.2015 | PL | 24.06.2015 | RO | 24.06.2015 | RS | 24.06.2015 | SE | 24.06.2015 | SI | 24.06.2015 | SK | 24.06.2015 | SM | 24.06.2015 | TR | 24.06.2015 | BG | 24.09.2015 | NO | 24.09.2015 | GR | 25.09.2015 | IS | 24.10.2015 | PT | 26.10.2015 | IE | 24.12.2015 | LU | 24.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | FR | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 24.12.2012 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
TR | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.12.2012 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.12.2012 | |
AT | 24.06.2015 | ||
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
BE | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 24.12.2015 | ||
LU | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 24.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 24.06.2015 | |
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.06.2015 | |
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
RS | 24.06.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2008125103 (MOCK VON A [US]) [AD] 1,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] *; | [A]US2007135995 (KIKUCHI SHIN [JP], et al) [A] 1,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0078] * | by applicant | US2008114533 | US2008125103 |