EP2610977 - EMI shielding members for connector cage [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amphenol Canada Corporation 605 Milner Avenue Ontario M1B 5X6 / CA | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zlatan Ljubijankic 7418 Village Walk Mississauga Ontario, L5W 1V7 / CA | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Sayer, Robert David, et al Agile IP LLP Airport House Purley Way GB-Croydon, Surrey CR0 0XZ / GB | [2013/27] | Application number, filing date | 12250140.6 | 16.08.2012 | [2013/27] | Priority number, date | US201113214618 | 22.08.2011 Original published format: US201113214618 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2610977 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2610977 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/6583, H05K9/00, // H01R12/58, H01R13/6587 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
H01R13/6583 (EP,US);
H01R12/58 (EP,US);
H01R13/6587 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/27] | H01R13/6583, // H01R12/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elemente zur EMI-Abschirmung für Steckergehäuse | [2013/27] | English: | EMI shielding members for connector cage | [2013/27] | French: | Éléments de blindage EMI pour connecteur cage | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 04.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/32] | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19644417 (SCHROFF GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8 * figures 2-5 *; | [X]US6225555 (SOSNOWSKI ANTHONY MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2008047745 (SMELTZ DAVID CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * figures 1-11 *; | [XAI]US7869224 (YANG HAVEN [TW]) [X] 10,14,15,17 * figures 1-8 * [A] 1-9[I] 16 |