EP2712760 - Device and method for detecting wheel-track friction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens S.A.S. 9, boulevard Finot 93527 Saint-Denis Cedex 2 / FR | [2014/35] |
Former [2014/14] | For all designated states Siemens SAS 9 Boulevard Finot 93200 St. Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Consoli, Luciano 70 Rue Dutot 75015 Paris / FR | [2014/14] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/14] | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12290320.6 | 27.09.2012 | [2014/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712760 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60L3/10, B60T8/17, H02P5/685, B60T8/172 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
B60T8/1705 (EP);
B60T8/172 (EP);
B60L2200/26 (EP);
B60L2220/46 (EP);
B60L2260/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/14] | B60L3/10, B60T8/17, H02P5/685 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erfassung der Reibung zwischen Rad und Fahrbahn | [2014/49] | English: | Device and method for detecting wheel-track friction | [2014/14] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de detection de frottement roue-piste | [2014/14] |
Former [2014/14] | Vorrichtung und Methode zur Erfassung des Reifenabriebs auf der Fahrbahn | Examination procedure | 19.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 16.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 02.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3663875 (ASHIYA MASAHIRO) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US3764867 (SMITH R) [A] 1-15 * figure 4 * | by applicant | US2735090 | US2004130618 | US2006180760 | US4071282 | US2008211434 | US4463289 |