EP2497945 - Mechanical reinforcement for a part made of a composite material, in particular for a large wind-turbine blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2022 | Revocation of patent | published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] | 18.11.2022 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epsilon Composite 5, Route de Hourtin 33340 Gaillan / FR | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lull, Stéphane 3 rue de la Corvette 33990 HOURTIN / FR | 02 /
Ferrer, Denis 16 rue des acacias 33180 VERTHEUIL / FR | 03 /
Portoles, José 1 Chemin de Queyzac 33340 QUEYRAC / FR | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | August Debouzy 7, rue de Téhéran 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2012/37] | Fantin, Laurent Aquinov Allée de la Forestière 33750 Beychac et Caillau / FR | Application number, filing date | 12305281.3 | 09.03.2012 | [2012/37] | Priority number, date | FR20110052013 | 11.03.2011 Original published format: FR 1152013 | [2012/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2497945 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2497945 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F03D80/00, B29C70/86, F01D5/28, B29L31/08, F03D1/06 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
B29C70/865 (EP,BR,US);
F01D5/282 (BR,US);
B29C70/302 (EP);
B29C70/545 (EP);
F03D1/065 (EP,BR,US);
F03D1/0675 (EP,BR,US);
F03D80/00 (EP,BR,US);
B29L2031/085 (EP,BR,US);
F05B2280/6003 (EP,BR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/37] | F03D1/06, F03D11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2012/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mechanische Verstärkung eines Verbundmaterialbauteils, insbesondere für Flügel einer Windkraftanlage großer Abmessungen | [2012/37] | English: | Mechanical reinforcement for a part made of a composite material, in particular for a large wind-turbine blade | [2012/37] | French: | Renfort mécanique pour piéce en matériau composite, notamment pour une pale d'éolienne de grandes dimensions | [2012/37] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 15.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK Opponent's representative Kent, Peter Joseph Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | 02
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Nordex Energy SE & Co. KG Langenhorner Chaussee 600 22419 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | 03
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75009 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | 04
20.10.2021
20.07.2021
INTERVENTION Vestas Deutschland GmbH Kapstadtring 7 22297 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/13] |
Former [2021/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK Opponent's representative Kent, Peter Joseph Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | ||
02
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Nordex Energy GmbH Langenhorner Chaussee 600 22419 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | |||
03
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75009 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | |||
04
20.10.2021
20.07.2021
INTERVENTION Vestas Deutschland GmbH Kapstadtring 7 22297 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
Former [2017/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK Opponent's representative Kent, Peter Joseph Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | ||
02
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Nordex Energy GmbH Langenhorner Chaussee 600 22419 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | |||
03
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75009 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | |||
Former [2017/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK Opponent's representative Kent, Peter Joseph Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | ||
02
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Nordex Energy GmbH Langenhorner Chaussee 600 22419 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Wilhelm-Straße 79-87 20355 Hamburg / DE | |||
03
10.05.2017
16.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75009 Paris / FR Opponent's representative Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | 20.06.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.12.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.04.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.09.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2022/51] | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 28.06.2019 | Appeal received No. T1790/19 | 28.08.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.09.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 26.06.2019 | Appeal received No. T1790/19 | 28.08.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.09.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 17.06.2019 | Appeal received No. T1790/19 | 28.08.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.09.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 28.06.2019 | Appeal received No. T1790/19 | 27.08.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 09.09.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 19.10.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 09.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | MT | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | RS | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | SM | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | IE | 09.03.2017 | LU | 09.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/46] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
IE | 09.03.2017 | ||
LU | 09.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.08.2016 | |
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
IE | 09.03.2017 | ||
LU | 09.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
MT | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
IE | 09.03.2017 | ||
LU | 09.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
IE | 09.03.2017 | ||
LU | 09.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
LU | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 10.08.2016 | |
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
SM | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/21] | HR | 10.08.2016 | |
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | HR | 10.08.2016 | |
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
RS | 10.08.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006002621 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-10* page 15, line 13 - page 17, line 7; figures 2a-3b *; | [X]WO2006082479 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,8,10 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 34 * * page 5, line 18 - line 23; figure 1 *; | [YA]GB2451192 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [Y] 5 * page 8, line 1 - line 7; figure 2 * [A] 1-4,6-10; | [XYI]WO2010065928 (MODULAR WIND ENERGY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10 * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 14, paragraph 3 - page 15, paragraph 1 * * page 20, paragraph 3 - page 22, paragraph 4; figures 4, 6A-6C, 8A-9C, 11A-11C * [Y] 5 [I] 9 | Examination | US2009220747 | EP2341239 | Opposition | WO2009059604 | WO2010065928 | EP2341239 | EP2497945 | US5916682 | US6228473 | WO2006002621 | WO2006082479 | US2008277053 | GB2451192 | US2009220747 | US2010143713 | EP2283995 | FR1152013 | WO2012013192 | US2007040294 | WO2010083840 | - chapter 2: pultrusion part design, chapter 2: pultrusion part design, Raymond W. Mever et al, Handbook of Pultrusion Technology, (19850000), pages 13 - 27, XP055380808 | - Avery et al, "compression strength of carbon filter laminates containing flaws with fiber waviness", Montana University_AIAA_2004_0174, (20040000), pages 54 - 63, XP055381851 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2514/6.2004-174 | - John F. Mandell, et al, "FATIGUE OF COMPOSITE MATERIALS AND SUBSTRUCTURES FOR WIND TURBINE BLADES", SANDIA_REPORT 2002_0771, (20020000), pages 1 - 282, XP055381853 | - "Composite Technologies Research GroupSELECTED PAPERS, REPORTS and STUDENT THESES", Montana State University, (20170000), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.montana.edu/composites/people/publications, XP055381854 | - BRYAN CHARLES BUNDY, "Use of Pultruded Carbon Fiber / Epoxy Inserts as Reinforcement in Composite Structures", A thesis submitted in partial fulfillment of the requirements for the degree, (20051200), pages 1 - 325, XP055381850 |