EP2642149 - System for measuring the temperature of braking parts of motor vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fiday Gestion 70360 Chassey-les-Scey / FR | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garnier, Jean-Pierre 22, Grande rue Courboux 70190 PENNESIERES / FR | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein 176 avenue Charles de Gaulle 92200 Neuilly sur Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Thinat, Michel Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 12305333.2 | 21.03.2012 | [2013/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2642149 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/10, F16D65/12, F16D66/00 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
F16D65/12 (EP);
F16D65/10 (EP);
F16D2066/001 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | System zur Messung der Temperatur von Bremsteilen von Kraftfahrzeugen | [2013/39] | English: | System for measuring the temperature of braking parts of motor vehicles | [2013/39] | French: | Système de mesure de la température de pièces de freinage de véhicules automobiles | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/19] | 24.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 19.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1148266 (KNORR BREMSE BR SYSTEME FUER S [DE]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0005] , [0007] - [0017] - [0026] - [0035]; figures 2,4 * [I] 5,6,8; | [X]DE4103917 (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,7,9,10 * column 1, lines 5-58 * * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4569600 (PRENICZNY ROBERT B [US], et al) [X] 1,4,9,10 * column 1, lines 4-56 * * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 37; figures 1-4 * |