EP2651093 - Method for pairing a security element to a telecommunications terminal and corresponding system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6 Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amiel, Patrice c/o GEMALTO SA Service brevets Avenue du Jujubier ZI Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat / FR | 02 /
Berard, Xavier c/o GEMALTO SA Service brevets Avenue du Jujubier ZI Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat / FR | 03 /
Valles, Grégory c/o GEMALTO SA Service brevets Avenue du Jujubier ZI Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat / FR | 04 /
Fine, Jean-Yves c/o GEMALTO SA Service brevets Avenue du Jujubier ZI Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat / FR | [2013/42] | Application number, filing date | 12305444.7 | 13.04.2012 | [2013/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2651093 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W12/08 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
H04L63/0853 (EP,US);
H04L63/20 (EP);
H04W12/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verbindungsverfahren eines Sicherheitselements mit einem Telekommunikationsendgerät, und entsprechendes System | [2013/42] | English: | Method for pairing a security element to a telecommunications terminal and corresponding system | [2013/42] | French: | Procédé d'appairage d'un élément de sécurité à un terminal de télécommunications et système correspondant | [2013/42] | Examination procedure | 17.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/42] | 02.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005094097 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,5,7,8 * figures 2a,2b,3 * * page 1, line 31 - page 2, line 9 * * page 2, line 14 - line 19 * * page 2, line 30 - line 31 * * page 6, line 28 - line 32 * * page 7, line 1 - line 4 * * page 7, line 24 - line 30 * * page 9, line 22 - line 32 * [I] 2-4,6; | [A]US2005239504 (ISHII ATSUSHI [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * |