EP2659890 - Methods and compositions for the treatment of fibrosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orphan Synergy Europe - Pharma 16 Rue du Général Leclerc 78000 Versailles / FR | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Tezier Herman, Béatrice, et al Cabinet Becker & Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2013/45] | Application number, filing date | 12305487.6 | 30.04.2012 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2659890 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47, A61P1/16 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
A61K31/4741 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung von Fibrose | [2013/45] | English: | Methods and compositions for the treatment of fibrosis | [2013/45] | French: | Procédé et compositions de traitement de la fibrose | [2013/45] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2014/15] | 30.11.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8803023 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009155611 (KINEMED INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-4 * claims 1,4,5 * * page 12, paragraph 0046 *; | [XY] - YUASA S ET AL, "SUPPRESSIVE EFFECTS OF TRITOQUALINE ON CELL GROWTH AND COLLAGEN SECRETION IN FIBROBLASTS", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1986), vol. 40, no. 2, ISSN 0021-5198, pages 339 - 341, XP002681392 [X] 1,2 * page 339, abstract * [Y] 1-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1254/jjp.40.339 | [X] - UMEZU K ET AL, "SUPPRESSIVE EFFECT OF TRITOQUALINE ON THE ACCELERATION OF FIBROSIS IN THE LIVER", FOLIA PHARMACOLOGICA JAPONICA, (1986), vol. 87, no. 3, ISSN 0015-5691, pages 291 - 300, XP002681393 [X] 1,2 * page 300, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1254/fpj.87.291 | [X] - YUASA S ET AL, "THERAPEUTIC EFFECT OF TRITOQUALINE ON CHRONIC LIVER INJURY MODEL IN RATS INDUCED BY CARBON TETRACHLORIDE", FOLIA PHARMACOLOGICA JAPONICA, (1985), vol. 85, no. 4, doi:10.1254/fpj.85.249, ISSN 0015-5691, pages 249 - 257, XP002681394 [X] 1,2 * page 257, abstract * | [Y] - ZIMMERMANN HENNING W ET AL, "Interleukin-8 Is Activated in Patients with Chronic Liver Diseases and Associated with Hepatic Macrophage Accumulation in Human Liver Fibrosis", PLOS ONE, (201106), vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 1932-6203, XP002681395 [Y] 1-4 * page 1, abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0021381 | by applicant | WO2007117704 | WO2008100539 | US2010144718 | - E. PUCHELLE; S. DE BENTZMANN; C. HUBEAU; J. JACQUOT; D. GAILLARD, "Mechanisms involved in cystic fibrosis airway inflammation", PEDIATRIC PULMONOLOGY, (2001), vol. 32, no. 23, pages 143 - 145 | - ZIMMERMANN HW ET AL., "Interleukin-8 Is Activated in Patients with Chronic Liver Diseases and Associated with Hepatic Macrophage Accumulation in Human Liver Fibrosis", PLOS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0021381, page E21381, XP002681395 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0021381 | - E P DI SEBASTIANO, GUT, (2000), vol. 47, pages 423 - 428 |