EP2573782 - Electric protection apparatus comprising a tie-bar supporting a movable contact [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garavelli, Jordane Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle World Trade Center 38EE1, 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
Terpend, Serge Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle World Trade Center 38EE1, 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | [2014/33] |
Former [2013/13] | 01 /
Garavelli, Jordane SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS Service Propriété Industrielle World Trade Center 38EE1, 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | ||
02 /
Terpend, Serge SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS Service Propriété Industrielle World Trade Center 38EE1, 5 Place Robert Schuman 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | Representative(s) | Colette, Marie-Françoise Schneider Electric Industries SAS Propriété Industrielle 160 Avenue des Martyrs 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/13] | Colette, Marie-Françoise Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle WTC - 38EE1 5, place Robert Schuman 38050 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12305913.1 | 26.07.2012 | [2013/13] | Priority number, date | FR20110002898 | 23.09.2011 Original published format: FR 1102898 | [2013/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2573782 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/02, H01H1/34, H01H1/48, H01H3/46, H01H1/42 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
H01H3/02 (EP);
H01H1/48 (EP);
H01H3/46 (EP);
H01H1/42 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/13] | H01H3/02, H01H1/34, H01H1/48, H01H3/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrische Schutzvorrichtung mit einem mit einem beweglichen Kontakt versehenen Schwinghebel | [2014/32] | English: | Electric protection apparatus comprising a tie-bar supporting a movable contact | [2013/13] | French: | Appareil de protection électrique comportant un palonnier supportant un contact mobile | [2013/13] |
Former [2013/13] | Elektrische Schutzvorrichtung mit einem bewegblichen Kontakt versehenen Schwinghebel | Examination procedure | 18.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 14.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/22] | 13.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1124239 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0029] *; | [A]EP0853326 (SACE SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 5 *; | [A]EP0817225 (GEC ALSTHOM T & D AG [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - column 6, line 21 * |