EP2693690 - A method, and a node for discovering a network topology [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.05.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/06] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klotsche, Ralf Schoenblickstrasse 26 75305 Neuenbuerg / DE | 02 /
Sienel, Jürgen Albrecht-Goes-Weg 19 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Kleinbub, Oliver, et al Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property & Standards Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/06] | Application number, filing date | 12305970.1 | 03.08.2012 | [2014/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2693690 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
H04L41/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Knoten zur Netzwerktopologieentdeckung | [2014/06] | English: | A method, and a node for discovering a network topology | [2014/06] | French: | Procédé et nýud pour découvrir une topologie de réseau | [2014/06] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 14.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.10.2014 | 23.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/25] | 09.02.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005063318 (XU ZHICHEN [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0023] - [0027] - [0032] - [0037] - [0041] - [0052] * [Y] 2,10; | [XY]US2008181135 (YALAGANDULA PRAVEEN [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0023] - [0029] - [0035] - [0040] - [0045] - [0059] - [0062] * [Y] 2,10; | [XY]US2010135168 (CHEN YI-PING [FR], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0036] - [0068] - [0096] * [Y] 2,10; | [XY] - Lehman, Li-wei; Lerman, Steven, (20030101), Discovering Network Neighborhoods Using Peer-to-Peer Lookups, URL: http://hdl.handle.net/1721.1/3676, (20130130), XP002691202 [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] * [Y] 2,10 | [XY] - LEHMAN L ET AL, "PCoord: network position estimation using peer-to-peer measurements", NETWORK COMPUTING AND APPLICATIONS, 2004. (NCA 2004). PROCEEDINGS. THI RD IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON BOSTON, MA, USA AUG. 30 - SEPT. 1, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040830), doi:10.1109/NCA.2004.1347756, ISBN 978-0-7695-2242-5, pages 15 - 24, XP010736731 [X] 1,3-9,11-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] * [Y] 2,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NCA.2004.1347756 | [Y] - MONTRESOR A ET AL, "Chord on Demand", PEER-TO-PEER COMPUTING, 2005. P2P 2005. FIFTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFE RENCE ON KONSTANZ, GERMANY 31-02 AUG. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050831), doi:10.1109/P2P.2005.4, ISBN 978-0-7695-2376-7, pages 87 - 94, XP010859354 [Y] 2,10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/P2P.2005.4 | [Y] - HUI ZHANG ET AL, "Improving lookup latency in distributed hash table systems using random sampling", IEEE / ACM TRANSACTIONS ON NETWORKING, IEEE / ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20051001), vol. 13, no. 5, doi:10.1109/TNET.2005.857106, ISSN 1063-6692, pages 1121 - 1134, XP001512531 [Y] 2,10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNET.2005.857106 |