EP2741487 - Video coding and decoding methods and corresponding devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrivon, Pierre c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs ZAC des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR | 02 /
Lopez, Patrick c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR | 03 /
Bordes, Philippe c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR | 04 /
Salmon, Philippe c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR | 05 /
Hiron, Franck c/o Technicolor R&D France 975, avenue des Champs Blancs 35576 Cesson Sévigné / FR | [2014/24] | Representative(s) | Perrot, Sébastien Technicolor R&D France Snc 975, avenue des Champs Blancs CS 17616 35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Perrot, Sébastien Technicolor 1-5 rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | Application number, filing date | 12306535.1 | 06.12.2012 | [2014/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2741487 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/60 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
H04N19/187 (EP);
H04N1/60 (EP);
H04N19/102 (EP);
H04N19/12 (EP);
H04N19/186 (EP);
H04N19/30 (EP);
H04N19/46 (EP);
H04N19/124 (EP);
H04N19/597 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Videokodier- und Dekodierverfahren und entsprechende Vorrichtungen | [2014/24] | English: | Video coding and decoding methods and corresponding devices | [2014/24] | French: | Procédés de codage et de décodage vidéo et dispositifs correspondants | [2014/24] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2012 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 21.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2008128898 (THOMSON LICENSING [FR], et al) [X] 1,9,17-21 * abstract * * page 3, line 18 - page 7, line 32 * * page 9, line 20 - page 9, line 32 * [I] 2,3,6-8,10-16; | [IA]WO2006039357 (TECHNICOLOR [US], et al) [I] 1-7,9-15,17-21 * abstract * * page 1, line 14 - page 1, line 32 * * page 4, line 32 - page 11, line 26 * [A] 8,16; | [A]US2010226427 (JUNG JAE-WOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0015] * * figures 1-6 *; | [I] - ITU-R SG 6 VIA SC 29 SECRETARIAT, "Liaison Statement from ITU-R SG 6 on UHDTV and HEVC - Working Party 6C, DRAFT NEW RECOMMENDATION ITU-R BT.[IMAGE-UHDTV]", 100. MPEG MEETING; 30-4-2012 - 4-5-2012; GENEVA; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, (20120607), no. m25241, XP030053584 [I] 1-3,6,7,9-11,14,15,17-21 * the whole document * | [A] - PEI S-C ET AL, "DEPENDENT SCALAR QUANTIZATION OF COLOR IMAGES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19950401), vol. 5, no. 2, doi:10.1109/76.388061, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 124 - 139, XP000509198 [A] 1,9,17-21 * section "I. Introduction" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/76.388061 | [A] - SUZUKI (SONY) T, "Proposal to support UHDTV colorimetory", 10. JCT-VC MEETING; 101. MPEG MEETING; 11-7-2012 - 20-7-2012; STOCKHOLM; (JOINT COLLABORATIVE TEAM ON VIDEO CODING OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ); URL: HTTP://WFTP3.ITU.INT/AV-ARCH/JCTVC-SITE/,, (20120718), no. JCTVC-J0577, XP030112939 [A] 1,4-7,9,12-15 * pages 2-4 * * Table E-10-9 "Colour primaries"; page 6 - page 7 * * Table E-10-10 "Transfer characteristics"; page 8 * * Table E-10-11 "Matrix coefficients"; page 11 - page 12 * | [A] - PARK J H ET AL, "Requirement of SVC color space scalability", 25. JVT MEETING; 82. MPEG MEETING; 21-10-2007 - 26-10-2007; SHENZHEN,CN; (JOINT VIDEO TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, (20071024), no. JVT-Y076, ISSN 0000-0137, XP030007280 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | [A] - MAIER T O, "COLOR PROCESSING FOR DIGITAL CINEMA 1: BACKGROUND, ENCODING AND DECODING EQUATIONS, ENCODING PRIMARIES, AND THE EXPONENT (1/2.6)", SMPTE - MOTION IMAGING JOURNAL, SOCIETY OF MOTION PICTURE AND TELEVISION ENGINEERS, WHITE PLAINS, NY, US, (20071001), vol. 116, no. 10, ISSN 0036-1682, pages 439 - 446, XP001507810 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |