EP2662847 - In-vehicle information delivery system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Achal Worldwide Enterprises AG Untermüli 7 6300 Zug / CH | [2015/29] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states ITCiCo Spain, S.L. Calle Unión n.2 - B Planta 4 (Quetglas - Vives Asesores) 07001 Palma de Mallorca / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braden, Jude Cami de Ca Na Cili Santa Maria del Cami 07320 Mallorca / ES | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Lehmann Novo, Maria Isabel, et al Alvarez de Baena, 4 28006 Madrid / ES | [2013/46] | Application number, filing date | 12380024.5 | 11.05.2012 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2662847 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2662847 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0967 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
G08G1/09675 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
G08G1/0967 (RU);
G01C21/362 (KR);
G01C21/365 (KR);
G08G1/096708 (KR);
G08G1/096775 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04W4/029 (RU)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | Informationsbereitstellungssystem und -verfahren im Fahrzeug | [2013/46] | English: | In-vehicle information delivery system and method | [2013/46] | French: | Système de livraison d'informations à l'intérieur d'un véhicule et procédé | [2013/50] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 07.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | MT | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | RS | 06.08.2014 | SM | 06.08.2014 | NO | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | IS | 06.12.2014 | [2020/16] |
Former [2020/15] | AL | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
TR | 06.08.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
SM | 06.08.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
MT | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
RS | 06.08.2014 | ||
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
NO | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | NO | 06.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004254715 (YAMADA KAZUNAO [JP]) [X] 1,13,14 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 3,4,6,18,19 * * page 2, paragraphs 23,24 * * page 3, paragraphs 35-43 *[I] 2-12; | [XI]WO2011109028 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1,13,14 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 6,7 * * page 4, paragraphs 8,9 * * page 9, paragraph 31 * [I] 2-12 | Examination | EP0994448 | by applicant | US2007124041 | JP2008273285 | WO2010065235 |