EP2695683 - Device for the maintenance of flat elements, in particular solar panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chemik Innovacion y Desarrollos S.L. Polígono Industrial Arretxe-Ugalde Edificio de Servicios, Oficina 108 20305 Irun / ES | [2017/29] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Chemik Innovacion y Desarrollos S.L. Polígono Industrial Arretxe-Ugalde Edificio de Servicios, Officina 108 20305 Irun / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chinchurreta Diaz, Juan Cruz Arrantzale auzoa 17 20280 HONDARRIBIA / ES | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Igartua, Ismael Galbaian S.Coop. Polo de Innovación Garaia Goiru Kalea 1 - P.O. Box 213 20500 Arrasate-Mondragón / ES | [2014/07] | Application number, filing date | 12382318.9 | 06.08.2012 | [2014/07] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695683 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02S40/10, B08B1/00, B08B3/02, F24J2/46 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
B08B1/30 (EP);
B08B3/024 (EP);
F24S40/20 (EP);
H02S40/10 (EP);
Y02E10/40 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/07] | B08B1/00, B08B3/02, F24J2/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Wartung flacher Elemente, insbesondere Sonnenkollektoren | [2014/07] | English: | Device for the maintenance of flat elements, in particular solar panels | [2014/07] | French: | Dispositif pour l'entretien d'éléments plats, en particulier des panneaux solaires | [2014/07] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 23.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 15.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202007006491U (SCHNEEWEIS HERBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0001] - [0108]; figures 1-4b; claims 1-22 *; | [XI]DE102006053704 (NOVATEC BIOSOL AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-9,11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0020]; figures 1-2; claims 1-22 * [I] 4,10,12; | [I]DE202009009020U (SCHIFFERS GUIDO [DE]) [I] 1,2,5,8,9,11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0015]; figures 1-3; claims 1-6 *; | [I]DE102010008131 (SCANSONIC MI GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0044]; figures 1-6; claims 1-7 *; | [I]EP2422889 (SOLAR CLEAN VOF [BE]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0028]; figures 1-6; claims 1-15 * | by applicant | EP2437001 |