EP2708209 - Scleral epimacular implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AJL Ophthalmic, S.A. Parque Tecnológico de Alava Ferdinand Zeppelin 1 01510 Miñano (Alava) / ES | For all designated states Nadal Reus, Jerónimo Pau Alcover 50, 3-1 08017 Barcelona / ES | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nadal Reus, Jerónimo Pau Alcover 50, 3-1 08017 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Salazar Salegui, Pedro José Parque Tecnológico de Álava Ferdinand Zeppelin, 1 01510 Miñano (Álava) / ES | 03 /
Pulido, José Parque Tecnológico de Álava Ferdinand Zeppelin, 1 01510 Miñano (Álava) / ES | 04 /
Barraquer Compte, Rafael Ignacio Parque Tecnológico de Álava Ferdinand Zeppelin, 1 01510 Miñano (Álava) / ES | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Stiebe, Lars Magnus Balder Paseo de la Castellana 93, 5 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Stiebe, Lars Magnus Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 120, 5° izda 28046 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 12382348.6 | 13.09.2012 | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2708209 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/14 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
A61F2/14 (EP,BR,US);
A61F9/00727 (EP,BR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Epimakulars Skleraimplantat | [2014/12] | English: | Scleral epimacular implant | [2014/12] | French: | Implant epimaculaire scléral | [2014/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2004066870 (RESTORVISION LTD [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 10, line 11 - line 12; figure 3 * [Y] 2-7; | [Y]EP1525860 (GAMBINI BERNARD [FR]) [Y] 2-7 * paragraph [0013]; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO0117460 (RESTORVISION INC [US], et al) [Y] 2-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008008366 (REFOCUS GROUP INC [US], et al) [Y] 2-7 * the whole document * |