EP2489251 - Pneumatic dosing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruns, Helmut An der Bürgerweide 15 27804 Berne / DE | 02 /
Mertens, Daniel Bremer Heerstraße 145b 26135 Oldenburg / DE | [2012/34] | Application number, filing date | 12401019.0 | 13.02.2012 | [2012/34] | Priority number, date | DE20111000829 | 19.02.2011 Original published format: DE102011000829 | DE20111053186 | 01.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011053186 | DE20111056738 | 21.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011056738 | [2012/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2489251 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2489251 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/08 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
A01C7/082 (EP);
A01C7/088 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/34] | Title | German: | Pneumatischer Dosierer | [2012/34] | English: | Pneumatic dosing device | [2012/34] | French: | Doseur pneumatique | [2012/34] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 02.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2012 | AL | 26.03.2014 | CY | 26.03.2014 | CZ | 26.03.2014 | DK | 26.03.2014 | EE | 26.03.2014 | ES | 26.03.2014 | FI | 26.03.2014 | HR | 26.03.2014 | LT | 26.03.2014 | LV | 26.03.2014 | MC | 26.03.2014 | MK | 26.03.2014 | MT | 26.03.2014 | NL | 26.03.2014 | PL | 26.03.2014 | RO | 26.03.2014 | RS | 26.03.2014 | SI | 26.03.2014 | SK | 26.03.2014 | SM | 26.03.2014 | TR | 26.03.2014 | BG | 26.06.2014 | NO | 26.06.2014 | GR | 27.06.2014 | IS | 26.07.2014 | PT | 28.07.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.02.2012 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MK | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 13.02.2012 | |
CY | 26.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
SM | 26.03.2014 | ||
TR | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
MT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
GR | 27.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
MC | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SI | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
DK | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
PT | 28.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
ES | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
NL | 26.03.2014 | ||
PL | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
SK | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RO | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
IS | 26.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
CZ | 26.03.2014 | ||
EE | 26.03.2014 | ||
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
BG | 26.06.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 26.03.2014 | |
FI | 26.03.2014 | ||
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
HR | 26.03.2014 | ||
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
LV | 26.03.2014 | ||
RS | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | FI | 26.03.2014 | |
LT | 26.03.2014 | ||
NO | 26.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 26.03.2014 | |
NO | 26.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5826523 (GREGOR DAVID WALTER [US]) [I] 1-4 * abstract * * column 7, line 46 - line 67 * * column 8, line 1 - line 15 * * column 11, line 57 - line 67 * * column 12, line 1 - line 8 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4852809 (DAVIS HAROLD A [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 7, line 45 - line 65 * * column 8, line 31 - line 64 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4296695 (QUANBECK SHERMAN H) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * column 4, line 61 - line 68 * * column 7, line 44 - line 57 * * column 9, line 3 - line 24 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US4453866 (RYAN AUSTIN T [AU]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 5 - line 34 * * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP1064833 |