EP2589280 - Plough body with a mouldboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laumann, Bernhard Blumenstraße 6 48477 Hörstel - Riesenbeck / DE | 02 /
Resch, Rainer Industriestr. 4 49170 Hagen a TW / DE | [2013/19] | Application number, filing date | 12401217.0 | 01.11.2012 | [2013/19] | Priority number, date | DE20111055031 | 04.11.2011 Original published format: DE102011055031 | [2013/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2589280 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2589280 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01B15/10 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
A01B15/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2013/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Pflugkörper mit einem Streichblech | [2013/19] | English: | Plough body with a mouldboard | [2013/19] | French: | Corps de charrue avec un versoir de charrue | [2013/19] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 12.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.11.2012 | AL | 30.09.2015 | BG | 30.09.2015 | CY | 30.09.2015 | CZ | 30.09.2015 | DK | 30.09.2015 | EE | 30.09.2015 | ES | 30.09.2015 | FI | 30.09.2015 | HR | 30.09.2015 | IT | 30.09.2015 | LT | 30.09.2015 | LV | 30.09.2015 | MC | 30.09.2015 | MK | 30.09.2015 | MT | 30.09.2015 | NL | 30.09.2015 | RO | 30.09.2015 | RS | 30.09.2015 | SE | 30.09.2015 | SI | 30.09.2015 | SK | 30.09.2015 | SM | 30.09.2015 | TR | 30.09.2015 | IE | 01.11.2015 | LU | 01.11.2015 | BE | 30.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | NO | 30.12.2015 | GR | 31.12.2015 | IS | 30.01.2016 | PT | 01.02.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 01.11.2012 | |
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 01.11.2015 | ||
LU | 01.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.11.2012 | |
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 01.11.2015 | ||
LU | 01.11.2015 | ||
BE | 30.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 01.11.2015 | ||
LU | 01.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 01.11.2015 | ||
LU | 01.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 01.11.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 30.09.2015 | |
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 30.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE202011002801U (LEMKEN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XP] 1,4,6,8,11 * abstract * * page 3, paragraphs 15,16 * * page 4, paragraph 16 * * figure -; claim - *; | [XI]US2217888 (BENJAMIN BERT R) [X] 1,2,5,11,12 * page 2, column l, lines 1-32 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 13; | [A]WO2008000989 (KUHN HUARD SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 12, line 10 - line 32 * * page 13, line 1 - line 19 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE8320000U (KVERLAND) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3522851 (REDDICK HAUL M SR, et al) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | EP1586229 |