EP2620067 - Sports footwear with parts made of a very rigid material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rossignol Lange S.R.L. Via San Gaetano 243 31044 Montebelluna / IT | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Posato, Tiziano Via des Rizzi 34 Maser (TV) 31010 / IT | 02 /
Dal Bello, Luca Vicolo Salvo D'Acquisto 17 Falze di Trevignano (TV) 31040 / IT | 03 /
Fregoni, Andrea Via Picasso 22 31038 Paese (TV) / IT | 04 /
Frare, Gabriele Via Dalmazia 67a Volpago Del Montello (TV) 31040 / IT | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Novaimo Europa 1 362, avenue Marie Curie Archamps Technopole 74166 Saint-Julien-en-Genevois Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Novaimo Bâtiment Europa 2 310 avenue Marie Curie Archamps Technopole 74166 Saint Julien en Genevois Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 12425016.8 | 25.01.2012 | [2013/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2620067 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04, B29D35/12 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
A43B5/0427 (EP);
A43B5/049 (EP);
B29D35/126 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sportschuh mit Teilen aus sehr steifem Material | [2013/31] | English: | Sports footwear with parts made of a very rigid material | [2013/31] | French: | Chaussure de sport avec parties en matériau très rigide | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 19.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006048908 (NOVATION S P A [IT], et al) [X] 1-12 * page 1, line 14 - page 8, line 31 *; | [A]EP1642706 (LANGE INT SA [CH]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009104410 (SIEGEL MICHAEL C [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * paragraphs [0005] - [0013] *; | [A]EP1462019 (LANGE INT SA [CH]) [A] 1,5 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1295540 | US2010180471 | FR2887178 |