EP2666940 - Device for locking the door of vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pastore & Lombardi S.r.l. Via Don Minzoni, 3 40057 Granarolo dell'Emilia, F. Cadriano (Bologna) / IT | [2013/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hilbe, Luca Via Collegio di Spagna, 7/2 40137 Bologna / IT | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners (IT) Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 12425097.8 | 21.05.2012 | [2013/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2666940 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/16, E05C9/08 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
E05B83/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Abschliessen der Türen von Fahrzeugen | [2013/48] | English: | Device for locking the door of vehicles | [2013/48] | French: | Dispositif de verrouillage de la porte des véhicules | [2013/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1013855 (PWP SA [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * the whole document * [I] 4,6; | [I]US4869023 (BAKULA ROBERT J [US], et al) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [I]GB1457810 (BLOXVICH LOCK STAMPING) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [I]US3099473 (PASTVA JR JOHN V) [I] 1-4,6-8 * the whole document *; | [I]US3329456 (OLANDER ROLAND J) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I]GB1002214 (MINER INC W H) [I] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [I]US2004000793 (SENN BRIAN A [US]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [I]US4068409 (WHITE CLARENCE E) [I] 1-6 * the whole document * |