EP2674504 - Method and system for thermal treatments of rails [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies Italy S.R.L. Via Luigi Pomini 92 21050 Marnate (VA) / IT | [2015/34] |
Former [2013/51] | For all designated states Siemens S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 10 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lainati, Alberto Gioachino Via Larga, 74A 21047 Saronno / IT | 02 /
Pegorin, Federico Via Lazio, 8D 21012 Cassano Magnago / IT | 03 /
Sciuccati, Augusto Via Premuda, 10 20025 Legnano / IT | 04 /
Langellotto, Luigi Via Odisseo, 20 00040 Pomzia (Roma) / IT | 05 /
Mazzarano, Andrea Via Ugo La Malfa, 5/B 00045 Gerenzano di Roma / IT | 06 /
Saccoci, Alessio Via Carlo Emilio Gadda, 97 00143 Roma / IT | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | Metals Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Capré, Didier, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12425110.9 | 11.06.2012 | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2674504 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C21D1/20, C21D9/04, C21D11/00, C21D1/667 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
C21D11/005 (EP,KR,US);
C21D9/04 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C21D1/18 (EP,US);
C21D1/20 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/667 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C21D11/00 (EP,RU,US);
C21D2211/002 (EP,US);
C21D2211/009 (EP,US);
C21D2221/00 (EP,US);
C21D2221/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Wärmebehandlung von Schienen | [2013/51] | English: | Method and system for thermal treatments of rails | [2013/51] | French: | Procédé et système pour traitements thermiques de rails | [2013/51] | Examination procedure | 16.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 05.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/16] | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0098492 (ALGOMA STEEL CORP LTD [CA]) [X] 1-14 * pages 9-23; figures 1-10,IIA, IIB; claims 1-19 *; | [A]US4668308 (ECONOMOPOULOS MARIOS [BE], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-10; claims 1-7 *; | [A]US5645653 (JERATH VIJAY [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 1-8; claims 1-9 *; | [A]US5762723 (UEDA MASAHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1-13; tables 1-9 *; | [A]JPH11152520 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2002020474 (MEYER MEINERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0020] - [0090]; figure 1; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US6689230 (MEYER MEINERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-14* figures 1-5; claims 1-4 * | by applicant | US7854883 |