EP2647899 - A camera slider/crane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dybowski, Janusz Ul. Wybickiego 42a2 81-842 Sopot / PL | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/41] | Representative(s) | Czub, Krzysztof Kancelaria Prawa Wlasnosci Przemyslowej i Prawa Autoskiego Teresa Czub & Krzysztof Czub Rzecznicy Patentowi Spólka Partnerska PO Box 12 80-700 Gdansk 2 / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Czub, Krzysztof Kancelaria Prawa Wilasnosci Przemyslowej i Prawa Autoskiego Teresa Czub & Krzysztof Czub Rzecznicy Patentowi Spólka Partnerska PO Box 12 80-900 Gdansk 2 / PL | Application number, filing date | 12460015.6 | 03.04.2012 | [2013/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2647899 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16M11/00, G03B17/56 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
F16M11/32 (EP);
F16M11/046 (EP);
F16M11/048 (EP);
F16M11/2021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kameraschieber/-kran | [2013/41] | English: | A camera slider/crane | [2013/41] | French: | Glissière/grue de caméra | [2013/41] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 10.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/42] | 22.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/42] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 14.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 14.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2005085948 (CHAPMAN LEONARD STUDIO EQUIP [US], et al) [X] 1 * camera slider/crane; page 9, line 19 - page 69, line 12; figures 1-67 * [I] 2-12; | [A]US2011008037 (VIGGIANO JUSTIN E [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * camera slider/crane; paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5940645 (BONIN STEVE G [US]) [A] 1-12 * camera slider/crane; column 3, line 15 - column 10, line 8; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | US5177516 | US5940645 |