EP2666956 - A modular electric system located under water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2016/43] |
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstr. 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piasecki, Wojciech Ul. Friedleina 28A/28 30-009 Krakow / PL | 02 /
Szewczyk, Marcin Ul. Guderskiego 7 m7 03-982 Warszawa / PL | 03 /
Stosur, Mariusz Ul. Zarowska 21 58-130 Imbramowice / PL | 04 /
Nalepa, Radoslaw Warta Boleslawicka 46a 59-720 Raciborowice / PL | 05 /
Wiik, Jan Finsvei 8 0575 Oslo / NO | 06 /
Bjornstad, Eiril Hesselbergsgate 8a Oslo / NO | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Chochorowska-Winiarska, Krystyna ABB Sp. z o. o. ul. Zeganska 1 04-713 Warszawa / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | Chochorowska-Winiarska, Krystyna ABB Sp. z o. o., Ul. Zeganska 1 04-713 Warszawa / PL | Application number, filing date | 12460023.0 | 21.05.2012 | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2666956 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E21B33/035, H02J3/36, E21B41/00, E21B33/037, H05K5/06, E21B47/01 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
E21B33/037 (EP,US);
E21B41/0085 (EP);
E21B47/017 (EP);
H05K5/067 (EP);
H05K7/14337 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Modulares elektrisches Unterwassersystem | [2013/48] | English: | A modular electric system located under water | [2013/48] | French: | Système électrique modulaire situé sous l'eau | [2013/48] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 12.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 20.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1335095 (CIE IND DES TELEPHONES) [X] 1-3,8 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1600095 (TRW INC) [A] 1-14* page 7, line 11 - line 73; figure 1 *; | [XI]US2008302115 (EKNES ERIK [NO], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * figure 3; claim 1 * [I] 4-7,9-14; | [X]EP2383428 (HYDRIL USA MFG LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraph [0061]; figure 8 * | by applicant | US4309734 | EP1963616 |