EP2719998 - Axisymmetric telescope centering device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolnoslaska Szkola Wyzsza Ul. Wagonowa 9 53-609 Wroclaw / PL | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wojciech, Anigacz Ul. Majora "Hubala" 18 B/2 45-267 Opole / PL | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Surmiak, Wieslawa Halina Ul. Stanislawa Mikolajczyka 5 45-271 Opole / PL | [2015/34] | Application number, filing date | 12460083.4 | 04.12.2012 | [2014/16] | Priority number, date | PL20120401110 | 09.10.2012 Original published format: PL 40111012 | [2014/16] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2719998 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2719998 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/27, G01C15/00 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
G01B11/27 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | Achsensymmetrische Teleskopzentriervorrichtung | [2014/16] | English: | Axisymmetric telescope centering device | [2014/16] | French: | Dispositif de centrage de télescope axisymétrique | [2014/16] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2012 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 26.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2012 | AL | 19.08.2015 | AT | 19.08.2015 | BE | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | ES | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | HR | 19.08.2015 | IT | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | MK | 19.08.2015 | MT | 19.08.2015 | NL | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | RS | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | SM | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | NO | 19.11.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | IE | 04.12.2015 | LU | 04.12.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | FR | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 04.12.2012 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.12.2012 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MK | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 04.12.2012 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RS | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 19.08.2015 | |
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US970631 (LOGGIE GEORGE W [US]) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004021865 (BYER MARK W [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0033]; figure 1B *; | [A]US515815 (C. H. BRIGHTLY ET AL.) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2856158 (ARTUR KUEPPER KG) [A] 1-4 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5359781 | US7467474 |