EP2661398 - PACKAGE FOR LAUNDRY SCENT ADDITIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2013/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPEZ, Natalie, Vitalia 516 Dandridge Str. Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
MCKINNEY, Adrian, Keith 167 Bannock Drive Maineville, Ohio 45039 / US | 03 /
HORSTMAN, Richard, Lawrence 5659 Oakvista Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45227 / US | 04 /
FINLEY, Kristin, Marie 4245 Minmor Drive Cincinnati, Ohio 45217 / US | 05 /
STRADER, Karen, Hussong 6774 Quarterhorse Dr. Clearcreek Twp., Ohio 45066 / US | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Kellenberger, Jakob NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [2014/45] |
Former [2014/42] | Vercruysse, Nicolas NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2013/52] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2013/46] | Pickford, James Lawrence Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12700585.8 | 05.01.2012 | WO2012US20249 | Priority number, date | US20110986658 | 07.01.2011 Original published format: US 986658 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012094439 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2661398 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2661398 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D25/36, B65D51/16, B65D75/00, B65D85/00, B65D41/26, B65D51/18, B65D77/00, B65D77/02, B65D77/22 | [2014/20] | CPC: |
B65D25/36 (EP,US);
B65D51/18 (EP,KR,US);
B65D75/002 (US);
A47L15/0055 (EP,US);
B65D1/0246 (US);
B65D41/04 (US);
B65D41/26 (EP,KR,US);
B65D43/16 (US);
B65D51/1633 (EP,US);
B65D75/5827 (US);
B65D77/00 (EP,US);
B65D77/02 (EP,US);
B65D77/22 (EP,US);
B65D83/06 (EP,US);
B65D85/70 (EP,US);
C11D17/06 (US);
C11D3/0084 (US);
C11D3/50 (US);
G01F19/00 (US);
B65D2203/12 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0015 (EP,US);
B65D2251/0021 (US);
B65D2251/0028 (US);
B65D2251/0078 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/46] | B65D41/26, B65D51/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG FÜR WASCHMITTELDUFTADDITIV | [2014/20] | English: | PACKAGE FOR LAUNDRY SCENT ADDITIVE | [2013/46] | French: | EMBALLAGE POUR ADDITIF DE PARFUM DE LESSIVE | [2014/20] |
Former [2013/46] | VERPACKUNG FÜR EINEN WÄSCHEDUFTZUSATZ | ||
Former [2013/46] | EMBALLAGE DESTINÉ À UN ADDITIF DE PARFUM DE LESSIVE | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 31.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.12.2014 | AT | 31.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | HR | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | LV | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | MK | 31.12.2014 | MT | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | RS | 31.12.2014 | SE | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | SM | 31.12.2014 | TR | 31.12.2014 | IE | 05.01.2015 | LU | 05.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | NO | 31.03.2015 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | PT | 01.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MK | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 05.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
PT | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 05.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
PT | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 05.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 05.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 05.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
IE | 05.01.2015 | ||
LU | 05.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2015 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
RS | 31.12.2014 | ||
SE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 31.12.2014 | |
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0391688 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-14 * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 25; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2005007523 (SOIE COQUINE YUGENGAISHA [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract * | by applicant | US20100732576 |