EP2661676 - WEB-BASED ARCHITECTURAL COLOR SELECTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2013/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARUSO, Christopher 553 Sunset Drive Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15228 / US | 02 /
LIPNISKIS, Jeffrey 167 Ralston Road Sarver Pennsylvania 16055 / US | 03 /
BEHRENS, Phillip J. 201 DuPont Drive McDonald Pennsylvania 15057 / US | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | polypatent BGL Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 12700877.9 | 03.01.2012 | WO2012US20068 | Priority number, date | US201161429642P | 04.01.2011 Original published format: US 201161429642 P | US201213342391 | 03.01.2012 Original published format: US201213342391 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012094309 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2661676 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
G06F3/048 (EP,KR,US);
G01J3/462 (EP,US);
G01J3/463 (EP,US);
G01J3/52 (EP,US);
G06F16/5838 (EP,US);
G06T11/001 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Title | German: | WEB-BASIERTES ARCHITEKTONISCHES FARBAUSWAHLSYSTEM | [2013/46] | English: | WEB-BASED ARCHITECTURAL COLOR SELECTION SYSTEM | [2013/46] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SÉLECTION DE COULEUR ARCHITECTURALE BASÉ SUR LE WEB | [2013/46] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 23.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004042336 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 8, line 1 - page 22, line 7; figures 3, 5, 6, 8 *; | [A]US2006001677 (WEBB MARC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009009745 (MOORE BENJAMIN & CO [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A] - Jay Joichi, "Improving color exploration and visualization on the ColorSmart by BEHR(TM) application", Proceeding DUX '05 Proceedings of the 2005 conference on Designing for User eXperience Article No. 4, ISBN 159593250X, (20050101), pages 2 - 16, URL: http://delivery.acm.org/10.1145/1140000/1138240/a4-joichi.pdf?ip=145.64.134.245&acc=ACTIVE SERVICE&CFID=104594029&CFTOKEN=48326140&__acm__=1337690949_5e0e81525952b18d6fa85d193083b7d4, (20120522), XP055027803 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |