EP2666023 - CURRENT MEASURING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCT Power GmbH Line-Eid-Str. 1 78467 Konstanz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/04] | For all designated states RCT Power GmbH Line Eid-Str. 1 78467 Konstanz / DE | ||
Former [2013/48] | For all designated states Sunways AG Photovoltaic Technology Macairestrasse 3-5 78467 Konstanz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBRENKO, Alexey Friedrichstraße 8 78464 Konstanz / DE | 02 /
LARIONOV, Pavel Allensteiner Straße 5 78464 Konstanz / DE | 03 /
HAUSER, Thomas Eichbühlstraße 8 78467 Konstanz / DE | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/11] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/48] | Hassa, Oliver Michael Isarpatent Friedrichstraße 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12701468.6 | 13.01.2012 | WO2012EP50498 | Priority number, date | DE20111002756 | 17.01.2011 Original published format: DE102011002756 | [2013/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012098054 | Date: | 26.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2666023 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2666023 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/18, G01R19/20 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
G01R15/185 (EP,US);
G01R19/00 (US);
G01R19/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMMESSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/48] | English: | CURRENT MEASURING DEVICE | [2013/48] | French: | APPAREIL DE MESURE DE COURANT | [2014/32] |
Former [2013/48] | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE COURANT | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 19.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 25.04.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 10.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2012 | AL | 11.03.2015 | BG | 11.03.2015 | CY | 11.03.2015 | CZ | 11.03.2015 | DK | 11.03.2015 | EE | 11.03.2015 | ES | 11.03.2015 | FI | 11.03.2015 | HR | 11.03.2015 | IT | 11.03.2015 | LT | 11.03.2015 | LV | 11.03.2015 | MC | 11.03.2015 | MK | 11.03.2015 | MT | 11.03.2015 | NL | 11.03.2015 | PL | 11.03.2015 | RO | 11.03.2015 | RS | 11.03.2015 | SE | 11.03.2015 | SI | 11.03.2015 | SK | 11.03.2015 | SM | 11.03.2015 | NO | 11.06.2015 | GR | 12.06.2015 | IS | 11.07.2015 | PT | 13.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 13.01.2012 | |
BG | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 13.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
PL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
ES | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SK | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 11.03.2015 | |
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 11.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US1524285 (ERNST BESAG) [X] 1,2,12,13,15,19,20 * page 1, lines 50-75; figures 1,2 * [I] 14; | [A]GB1488262 (TI LTD) [A] 1* figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [XI]US4276510 (TOMPKINS RUSSELL E, et al) [X] 1-3,5,8,10,12,13,15-17,19,20 * column 6, line 25 - column 8, line 22; figures 1,4,5 * [I] 4,6,11,14; | [A]EP1505398 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]) [A] 1,14 * abstract *; | [XI]WO2010082115 (SENECA S R L [IT]) [X] 1-4,12,13,15,16 * page 1, lines 5-23; figures 1-6 * [I] 10,11,14 | by applicant | US4276510 | EP1505398 | WO2010082115 |