EP2670681 - CONTAINER FOR SMOKELESS TOBACCO PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Snuff Company, LLC 813 Ridge Lake Boulevard Memphis, Tennessee 38120 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states American Snuff Company, LlC 813 Ridge Lake Boulevard Memphis, Tennessee 38120 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATEL, Pankaj 3761 Squirewood Drive Clemmons, North Carolina 27012 / US | 02 /
THOMAS, Timothy, Frederick 3601 Blairwood Street High-Point, North Carolina 27265 / US | 03 /
JONES, William, Michael 456 Tipton Lake Circle West Atoka, Tennessee 38053 / US | [2013/50] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/50] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 12702163.2 | 30.01.2012 | WO2012US23100 | Priority number, date | US201113017325 | 31.01.2011 Original published format: US201113017325 | [2013/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012106237 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2670681 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2670681 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2670681 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/02, B65D51/16, A24F23/00 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
A24F23/00 (EP,US);
B65D43/0222 (EP,US);
B65D51/1627 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00277 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00527 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00537 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR RAUCHFREIE TABAKPRODUKTE | [2013/50] | English: | CONTAINER FOR SMOKELESS TOBACCO PRODUCTS | [2013/50] | French: | CONTENANT POUR PRODUITS DE TABAC SANS FUMEE | [2015/04] |
Former [2013/50] | CONTENANT POUR PRODUITS DE TABAC SANS FUMÉE | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 17.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2012 | AL | 17.06.2015 | AT | 17.06.2015 | BE | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | HR | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MK | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | RS | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | SM | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | NO | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | IE | 30.01.2016 | LU | 30.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AT | 17.06.2015 | ||
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
IE | 30.01.2016 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
BE | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 30.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.06.2015 | |
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2010066510 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB], et al) [X] 1,3-8,13 * page 4, lines 4-21; figures 1-3 * [Y] 9,14,15 [I] 2,12; | [XI]WO2010060723 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB], et al) [X] 1,4-8,13 * page 3, line 24 - page 5, line 15; figures 1, 2 * [I] 2,3,12; | [YDA]US4190170 (BOYD EUGENE J [US]) [YD] 9,15 * column 2, line 20; figures 1, 2, 4, 5 * [A] 1-3,8,12,13; | [YA]US2007110928 (BRIED DAVID K [US], et al) [Y] 14 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 39]; figures 8, 9 * [A] 1,5-7,12,13 | by applicant | US1376586 | US3696917 | US4513756 | US4528993 | US4624269 | US4991599 | US4987907 | US5092352 | US5387416 | US6668839 | US6834654 | US6953040 | US7032601 | US7694686 | US7810507 | US7819124 | US7861728 | US2004020503 | US2005115580 | US2005244521 | US2006191548 | US2007062549 | US2008029116 | US2008029117 | US2008173317 | US2008196730 | US2008209586 | US2008305216 | US2009065013 | US2009293889 | US2010291245 | WO2004095959 | WO2010132444 | US4098421 | US4190170 | US2010065076 | US2010065077 | US3368567 | US4606357 | US4821749 | US5167244 | US4975270 | US4802498 | US2004217024 | US2006118589 | US2009014450 | WO2006034450 | WO2007017761 | WO2007067953 | US2004118422 | US4607479 | US4631899 | US5346734 | US6162516 | US2005061339 |