EP2670629 - OPERATOR CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2013/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜNINGHAUS, Andreas Zum Bismarckturm 5 51674 Wiehl / DE | 02 /
KERN, Thorsten Alexander Alte Bergstraße 89 64665 Alsbach / DE | 03 /
KUDASCHOV, Vitali Königsberger Straße 22 61184 Karben / DE | [2013/50] | Application number, filing date | 12702221.8 | 30.01.2012 | [2016/26] | WO2012EP51408 | Priority number, date | DE20111009840 | 31.01.2011 Original published format: DE102011009840 | [2013/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012104235 | Date: | 09.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2670629 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2670629 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02, G06F3/01, F16M13/00, G06F1/16, H04M1/04 | [2013/50] | CPC: |
B60R11/02 (EP,US);
G08B6/00 (US);
B60K35/10 (EP,US);
B60K35/22 (EP);
B60K35/28 (EP,US);
B60K35/29 (EP,US);
B60K35/80 (EP,US);
B60K35/81 (EP,US);
G06F1/1632 (EP,US);
H04M1/04 (EP,US);
B60K2360/11 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1438 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1442 (EP,US);
B60K2360/146 (EP,US);
B60K2360/1868 (EP,US);
B60K2360/566 (EP,US);
B60K2360/573 (EP,US);
B60K2360/834 (EP,US);
B60K35/50 (US);
B60R2011/0075 (EP,US);
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
H04M2250/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDIENEINRICHTUNG | [2013/50] | English: | OPERATOR CONTROL DEVICE | [2013/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2013/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.09.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.09.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 18.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2012 | AL | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | DK | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | ES | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | HR | 29.06.2016 | IT | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | MK | 29.06.2016 | MT | 29.06.2016 | NL | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | RS | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | SM | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | NO | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | AT | 30.01.2017 | GB | 30.01.2017 | IE | 30.01.2017 | LU | 30.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
AT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
AT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.01.2012 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
AT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
AT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
AT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
AT | 30.01.2017 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
GB | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | |
NO | 29.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004075676 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al); | [A]EP1764674 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]WO2008030594 (ORIGIN INC F [US], et al); | [A]US2009166098 (SUNDER ASHWIN [US]); | [ADP]DE102010007486 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) | Examination | US2009051509 | US2009292851 | by applicant | DE102010007486 |