EP2686136 - POWER TOOL BRAKING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESENWEIN, Florian Veilchenstr. 9 73066 Uhingen-Holzhausen / DE | [2014/04] | Application number, filing date | 12703280.3 | 02.02.2012 | [2015/41] | WO2012EP51720 | Priority number, date | DE20111005812 | 18.03.2011 Original published format: DE102011005812 | [2014/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012126660 | Date: | 27.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2686136 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2686136 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B24B23/02, B24B47/26, B25F5/00 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
B24B23/028 (EP,US);
B24B23/02 (US);
B24B47/26 (EP,US);
B25F5/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUGMASCHINENBREMSVORRICHTUNG | [2014/04] | English: | POWER TOOL BRAKING DEVICE | [2014/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE DE MACHINE-OUTIL | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 15.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.02.2012 | AL | 07.10.2015 | BG | 07.10.2015 | CY | 07.10.2015 | CZ | 07.10.2015 | DK | 07.10.2015 | EE | 07.10.2015 | ES | 07.10.2015 | FI | 07.10.2015 | HR | 07.10.2015 | IT | 07.10.2015 | LT | 07.10.2015 | LV | 07.10.2015 | MC | 07.10.2015 | MK | 07.10.2015 | MT | 07.10.2015 | NL | 07.10.2015 | PL | 07.10.2015 | RS | 07.10.2015 | SE | 07.10.2015 | SI | 07.10.2015 | SK | 07.10.2015 | SM | 07.10.2015 | TR | 07.10.2015 | NO | 07.01.2016 | GR | 08.01.2016 | IE | 02.02.2016 | LU | 02.02.2016 | IS | 07.02.2016 | PT | 08.02.2016 | BE | 29.02.2016 | CH | 29.02.2016 | FR | 29.02.2016 | LI | 29.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 02.02.2012 | |
BG | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IE | 02.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 02.02.2012 | |
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IE | 02.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 02.02.2012 | |
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IE | 02.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IE | 02.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IE | 02.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
FR | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IE | 02.02.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
CH | 29.02.2016 | ||
LI | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 02.02.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RS | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19730198 (SCINTILLA AG [CH]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1240983 (NAKAMURA DAIJIRO [JP]) [X] 1-5 * figures 16,17 *; | [X]EP1577039 (POSITEC POWER TOOLS SUZHOU CO [CN]) [X] 1,2 * column 31; figures 2,6 *; | [X]WO2006122571 (METABOWERKE GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 6, column 5 - page 7, column 1; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2138279 (METABOWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10* figure 4 * | Examination | DE60220203T | by applicant | DE19510291 |